This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 06/24/2023 at 18:02:50 (UTC).

Aguilera v. Toll House CA Hotel Manager, LLC, et al. (Class Action)

Case Summary

On 04/25/2023 Aguilera filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Toll House CA Hotel Manager, LLC, Class Action. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4786

  • Filing Date:

    04/25/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Liliana Marines Aguilera

Defendants

Elizabeth Procaccianti

James A. Procaccianti

Rob Hendricks

TOLL HOUSE CA HOTEL MANAGER, LLC

Not Classified By Court

Superior Court of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jean Hopkins Power

David D Bibiyan

Jeffrey D Klein

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara

 

Court Documents

Order: Deeming Case Complex

4/25/2023 Order: Deeming Case Complex

Civil Lawsuit Notice

4/25/2023 Civil Lawsuit Notice

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/25/2023 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons: Issued/Filed

4/25/2023 Summons: Issued/Filed

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

4/25/2023 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Notice

5/30/2023 Notice

Notice: Related Cases

6/6/2023 Notice: Related Cases

 

Docket Entries

08/24/2023

HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 1; Time: 2:30PM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Notice: Related Cases; Filed By: Elizabeth Procaccianti, James Procaccianti, Rob Hendricks, TOLL HOUSE CA HOTEL MANAGER, LLC,; Comment: Notice of Related Case 19STCV31133 (Los Angeles County Superior Court)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/30/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Notice; Filed By: Elizabeth Procaccianti, James Procaccianti, Rob Hendricks, TOLL HOUSE CA HOTEL MANAGER, LLC,; Comment: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/25/2023

DocketDescription: New Filed Case

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Liliana Marines Aguilera,; Comment: Class Action Complaint + Complex Fee paid by Plaintiff

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Liliana Marines Aguilera,; Comment: Summons

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Liliana Marines Aguilera,; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet * Complex * Class Action

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Civil Lawsuit Notice; Comment: Civil Lawsuit Notice * 1st CMC set for 8/24/23 at 2:30pm in D1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Order: Deeming Case Complex; Filed By: Superior Court of California,; Comment: Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline - signed/SRK.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less