This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 11/10/2023 at 18:02:23 (UTC).

The People of the State of California vs James Milton Meech

Case Summary

On 09/11/2023 The People of the State of California filed an Other lawsuit against James Milton Meech. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2927

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners

DOMINIQUE THOM

ANDRE THOM

Appellant

James Milton Meech

Respondents

Superior Court Of California

Superior Court Of California County Of Santa Clara

The People Of The State Of California

Not Classified By Court

x

San Jose Facility - Criminal

Interested Party

Kent Family LTD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

William H. Safford

Respondent Attorney

Kaci R. Lopez

 

Court Documents

Notice: Appeal

9/12/2023 Notice: Appeal

Order

10/10/2023 Order

 

Docket Entries

10/10/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Order; Filed By: James Meech,; Comment: Order appointing William H. Safford as counsel for appellant - signed by Judges Williams and Kuhnle (envelope #13254259)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Notice: Appeal; Filed By: James Meech,; Comment: San Jose Facility - Criminal (C2216979)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023

DocketDescription: New Filed Case

[+] Read More [-] Read Less