This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 11/05/2023 at 18:02:22 (UTC).

West v. Guitar Center Stores, Inc. (Class Action)

Case Summary

On 09/06/2023 West filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Guitar Center Stores, Inc Class Action. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1938

  • Filing Date:

    09/06/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Trevor West

Defendant

Guitar Center Stores, Inc.

Not Classified By Court

Superior Court of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jessica Lynn Campbell

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara

 

Court Documents

Summons: Issued/Filed

9/6/2023 Summons: Issued/Filed

Civil Lawsuit Notice

9/6/2023 Civil Lawsuit Notice

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/6/2023 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

9/6/2023 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Order: Deeming Case Complex

9/8/2023 Order: Deeming Case Complex

 

Docket Entries

01/25/2024

HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 1; Time: 2:30PM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Order: Deeming Case Complex; Comment: Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline - signed/SRK.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023

DocketDescription: New Filed Case

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Trevor West,; Comment: Class Action Complex + Complex Fee by Plaintiff

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Trevor West,; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet * Complex * Class Action

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Civil Lawsuit Notice; Comment: Civil Lawsuit Notice * 1st CMC set for 1/25/24 at 2:30pm in D1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Trevor West,; Comment: Summons

[+] Read More [-] Read Less