This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 10/16/2023 at 17:05:46 (UTC).

Villa v. Cal Door and Drawer, Inc., et al. (Class Action/PAGA)

Case Summary

On 09/18/2023 Villa filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Cal Door and Drawer, Inc , Class Action/PAGA. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2688

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Abundio Villa

Defendants

Cal Door and Drawer, Inc.

California Kitchen Cabinet Door Corporation

Not Classified By Court

Superior Court of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nadir David Alami

Shaheen A. Etemadi

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/18/2023 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons: Issued/Filed

9/18/2023 Summons: Issued/Filed

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

9/18/2023 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Order: Deeming Case Complex

9/21/2023 Order: Deeming Case Complex

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

9/25/2023 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

10/5/2023 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

 

Docket Entries

02/01/2024

HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 1; Time: 2:30PM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Abundio Villa,; Comment: Proof of Service Summons

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Abundio Villa,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint (Proof of Service)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Order: Deeming Case Complex; Comment: Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline - signed/SRK.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023

DocketDescription: New Filed Case

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Abundio Villa,; Comment: Class Action & Representative Action Complaint + Plaintiff's Complex Fee

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Abundio Villa,; Comment: Summons

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Abundio Villa,; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet * Complex * Class Action and PAGA

[+] Read More [-] Read Less