This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 09/17/2023 at 01:02:09 (UTC).

United Financial Casualty Company vs Jorge Lopez

Case Summary

On 05/19/2023 United Financial Casualty Company filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Jorge Lopez. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6613

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United Financial Casualty Company

Defendant

Jorge Lopez

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mark R. Nivinskus

 

Court Documents

Declaration

5/19/2023 Declaration

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/19/2023 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons: Issued/Filed

5/19/2023 Summons: Issued/Filed

Complaint (Limited): Up to $10K

5/19/2023 Complaint (Limited): Up to $10K

Request: Dismissal

8/24/2023 Request: Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2023
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 16; Time: 1:30PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Request: Dismissal; Filed By: United Financial Casualty Company,; Comment: Entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Limited): Up to $10K; Filed By: United Financial Casualty Company,; Comment: Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: United Financial Casualty Company,; Comment: Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: United Financial Casualty Company,; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Declaration; Filed By: United Financial Casualty Company,; Comment: Statement of Damages

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less