This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 11/06/2023 at 18:03:36 (UTC).

Porter, et al. v. RM Executive Transportation (PAGA)

Case Summary

On 09/07/2023 Porter, filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against RM Executive Transportation PAGA. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2027

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Samuel Porter

Evelyn Wright

Defendant

RM Executive Transportation

Not Classified By Court

Superior Court of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Zachary Miles Crosner

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/7/2023 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons: Issued/Filed

9/7/2023 Summons: Issued/Filed

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

9/7/2023 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Civil Lawsuit Notice

9/7/2023 Civil Lawsuit Notice

Order: Deeming Case Complex

9/12/2023 Order: Deeming Case Complex

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

9/13/2023 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

 

Docket Entries

01/24/2024

HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 19; Time: 2:30PM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Samuel Porter,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint (Proof of Service)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Order: Deeming Case Complex; Comment: Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline - signed/TCZ.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023

DocketDescription: New Filed Case

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Samuel Porter,; Comment: PAGA Representative Complaint

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Samuel Porter,; Comment: Summons

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Samuel Porter,; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet * Complex * PAGA

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Civil Lawsuit Notice; Comment: Civil Lawsuit Notice * 1st CMC set for 1/24/24 at 2:30pm in D19

[+] Read More [-] Read Less