This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/31/2023 at 17:05:54 (UTC).

CONCRETE DEMO WORKS, INC. vs PRECISION FIBER OPTICS, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 08/03/2023 CONCRETE DEMO WORKS, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PRECISION FIBER OPTICS, INC. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0304

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CONCRETE DEMO WORKS, INC.

Defendants

PRECISION FIBER OPTICS, INC.

ARCH INSURANCE COMPANY

SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

William Mitchell Kaufman

 

Court Documents

Summons: Issued/Filed

8/3/2023 Summons: Issued/Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/3/2023 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

8/3/2023 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

8/23/2023 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

8/25/2023 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

 

Docket Entries

01/16/2024

HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 16; Time: 1:30PM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: CONCRETE DEMO WORKS, INC. ,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint as to Defendant Suretec Insurance Company

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: CONCRETE DEMO WORKS, INC. ,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint as to Defendant Arch Insurance Company

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/03/2023

DocketDescription: New Filed Case

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: CONCRETE DEMO WORKS, INC. ,; Comment: Complaint for Breach of Contract; Common Count; Quantum Meruit; and Claim Upon License Bond

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: CONCRETE DEMO WORKS, INC. ,; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: CONCRETE DEMO WORKS, INC. ,; Comment: Summons

[+] Read More [-] Read Less