This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 07/07/2023 at 18:07:52 (UTC).

Lee, et al. v. HCA Healthcare, Inc., et al.

Case Summary

On 05/08/2023 Lee, filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against HCA Healthcare, Inc ,. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6030

  • Filing Date:

    05/08/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Binita KC

Mary Christine Lee

Charissa Belulia

Hoang Nha Uyen (Marie) Nguyen

Jasmine Jaswal

Sheree Romis

Tania Tkachuk

Tanya Tkachuk

Defendants

HCA Healthcare, Inc.

HealthTrust Workforce Solutions, LLC

Benefit Recovery

San Jose Healthcare System, LP

Good Samaritan Hospital, LP

San Jose Healthcare System, LP, d/b/a Regional Medical Center of San Jose

Good Samaritan Hospital, LP, d/b/a Good Samaritan Hospital

Not Classified By Court

Superior Court of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Eric Jason Wiesner

Nicole J Daro

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara

 

Court Documents

Request

6/27/2023 Request

Order: Proposed

6/27/2023 Order: Proposed

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

6/5/2023 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service

5/30/2023 Proof of Service

Proof of Service

5/30/2023 Proof of Service

Proof of Service

5/30/2023 Proof of Service

Proof of Service

5/30/2023 Proof of Service

Notice

5/30/2023 Notice

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

5/25/2023 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service

5/25/2023 Proof of Service

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

5/23/2023 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

5/23/2023 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

5/23/2023 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

5/23/2023 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Order: Deeming Case Complex

5/22/2023 Order: Deeming Case Complex

Civil Lawsuit Notice

5/19/2023 Civil Lawsuit Notice

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

5/8/2023 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/8/2023 Civil Case Cover Sheet

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2023
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 19; Time: 2:30PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Request; Filed By: Binita KC, Mary Lee, Charissa Belulia, Hoang Nha Uyen (Marie) Nguyen, Jasmine Jaswal, Sheree Romis, Tania Tkachuk,; Comment: Plaintiffs' Administrative Request to Place Unredacted Complaint into the Public Court File

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order: Proposed; Filed By: Binita KC, Mary Lee, Charissa Belulia, Hoang Nha Uyen (Marie) Nguyen, Jasmine Jaswal, Sheree Romis, Tania Tkachuk,; Comment: Order Granting Plaintiffs' Administrative Request to Place Unredacted Complaint into the Public Court File

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Mary Lee,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint (Proof of Service)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service; Filed By: Mary Lee,; Comment: Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service; Filed By: Mary Lee,; Comment: Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service; Filed By: Mary Lee,; Comment: Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service; Filed By: Mary Lee,; Comment: Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice; Filed By: Binita KC, Mary Lee, Charissa Belulia, Hoang Nha Uyen (Marie) Nguyen, Jasmine Jaswal, Sheree Romis, Tania Tkachuk,; Comment: Plaintiffs Complex Case Fee

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Mary Lee,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint (Proof of Service)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 05/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Mary Lee,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint (Proof of Service)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Mary Lee,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint (Proof of Service)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order: Deeming Case Complex; Comment: Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline - signed/TCZ.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Lawsuit Notice; Comment: CORRECTED Civil Lawsuit Notice * 1st CMC set for 9/13/23 at 2:30pm in D19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Binita KC, Mary Lee, Charissa Belulia, Hoang Nha Uyen (Marie) Nguyen, Jasmine Jaswal, Sheree Romis, Tania Tkachuk,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Binita KC, Mary Lee, Charissa Belulia, Hoang Nha Uyen (Marie) Nguyen, Jasmine Jaswal, Sheree Romis, Tania Tkachuk,; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet (Comment)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Binita KC, Mary Lee, Charissa Belulia, Hoang Nha Uyen (Marie) Nguyen, Jasmine Jaswal, Sheree Romis, Tania Tkachuk,; Comment: Summons (Summons)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Declaration; Filed By: Binita KC, Mary Lee, Charissa Belulia, Hoang Nha Uyen (Marie) Nguyen, Jasmine Jaswal, Sheree Romis, Tania Tkachuk,; Comment: Notice to All Defendants That Records Lodged With the Court Pursuant to CRC 2.551 Will Be Placed In the Public Court File Unless Defendants File A Motion Or An Application to Seal the Records Within Ten Days (Declarations)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • DocketDescription: Lodged Under Seal; Filed By: Binita KC, Mary Lee, Charissa Belulia, Hoang Nha Uyen (Marie) Nguyen, Jasmine Jaswal, Sheree Romis, Tania Tkachuk,; Comment: Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less