This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 04/22/2023 at 18:02:07 (UTC).

Jose Ramirez vs DGDG 4 LLC

Case Summary

On 02/21/2023 Jose Ramirez filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DGDG 4 LLC. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8937

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jose Ramirez

Defendant

DGDG 4 LLC

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim-$1,501 to $5,000

2/21/2023 Plaintiff's Claim-$1,501 to $5,000

Proof of Service: Personal

2/23/2023 Proof of Service: Personal

Order

4/5/2023 Order

Minute Order

4/5/2023 Minute Order

Minute Order

4/6/2023 Minute Order

Judgment: Notice of Entry (Small Claims)

4/6/2023 Judgment: Notice of Entry (Small Claims)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Department: Department 15; Time: 8:30AM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Judgment: Notice of Entry (Small Claims)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Department: Department 15; Time: 8:30AM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order; Comment: SMALL CLAIMS ORDER. (View Order for full details.)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Personal; Filed By: Jose Ramirez, DGDG 4 LLC,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Plaintiff's Claim-$1,501 to $5,000

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less