This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 07/03/2023 at 18:07:58 (UTC).

Guizar v. Air Culinaire Worldwide, LLC (PAGA)

Case Summary

On 05/04/2023 Guizar filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Air Culinaire Worldwide, LLC PAGA. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5879

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Eduardo Martinez Guizar

Defendant

Air Culinaire Worldwide, LLC

Not Classified By Court

Superior Court of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Harout A Messrelian

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/4/2023 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

5/4/2023 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Summons: Issued/Filed

5/4/2023 Summons: Issued/Filed

Civil Lawsuit Notice

5/16/2023 Civil Lawsuit Notice

Order: Deeming Case Complex

5/31/2023 Order: Deeming Case Complex

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2023
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 1; Time: 2:30PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order: Deeming Case Complex; Comment: Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline - signed/SRK.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Lawsuit Notice; Comment: (CORRECTED) Civil Lawsuit Notice * 1st CMC set for 9/7/23 at 2:30pm in D1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Eduardo Guizar,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Eduardo Guizar,; Comment: *COMPLEX*

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Eduardo Guizar,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less