This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 09/10/2023 at 11:15:09 (UTC).

Erick Perez et al vs Ford Motor Company et al

Case Summary

On 05/22/2023 Erick Perez filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Ford Motor Company. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6482

  • Filing Date:

    05/22/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Erick Perez

Jesus E Perez

Defendants

Ford Motor Company

FFBH MOTORS, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Tionna Dolin

Defendant Attorneys

Spencer Peter Hugret

John William Ranucci

 

Court Documents

Summons: Issued/Filed

5/22/2023 Summons: Issued/Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/22/2023 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

5/22/2023 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

5/30/2023 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

6/15/2023 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

6/26/2023 Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

7/5/2023 Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/24/2023
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 20; Time: 3:00PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: FFBH MOTORS, LLC,; Comment: To Complaint; Atty: Ranucci

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Ford Motor Company ,; Comment: to complaint : Atty: Hugret

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Erick Perez, Jesus Perez,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Erick Perez, Jesus Perez,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Erick Perez, Jesus Perez,; Comment: Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Erick Perez, Jesus Perez,; Comment: Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Erick Perez, Jesus Perez,; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less