This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 09/11/2023 at 11:21:58 (UTC).

Trace3, LLC v. Sycomp, A Technology Company, Inc., et al.

Case Summary

On 05/12/2023 Trace3, LLC filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against Sycomp, A Technology Company, Inc ,. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5833

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Trace3, LLC

Defendants

Timothy Cordell

Lilian Elias

Geoffrey Peterson

Devin Tomcik

Sycomp a Technology Company, Inc.

Not Classified By Court

Superior Court of California

Interested Party

Stacy Thompson Thompson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nicole Susan Phillis

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara

 

Court Documents

Motion: Compel

9/7/2023 Motion: Compel

Declaration: In Support

9/7/2023 Declaration: In Support

Notice

9/7/2023 Notice

Order: Proposed

9/7/2023 Order: Proposed

Proof of Service

9/7/2023 Proof of Service

Separate Statement

9/7/2023 Separate Statement

Motion: Seal

8/28/2023 Motion: Seal

Declaration: In Support

8/28/2023 Declaration: In Support

Order

6/26/2023 Order

Motion: Seal

5/17/2023 Motion: Seal

Declaration: In Support

5/17/2023 Declaration: In Support

Notice

5/17/2023 Notice

Order: Proposed

5/17/2023 Order: Proposed

Order: Deeming Case Complex

5/17/2023 Order: Deeming Case Complex

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

5/12/2023 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Civil Lawsuit Notice

5/12/2023 Civil Lawsuit Notice

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/12/2023 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons: Issued/Filed

5/12/2023 Summons: Issued/Filed

240 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Motion: Compel; Department: Department 1; Time: 1:30PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Hearing: Other; Department: Department 1; Time: 9:00AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Motion: Seal Records; Department: Department 1; Time: 9:00AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Hearing: Other; Department: Department 1; Time: 1:30PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 1; Time: 2:30PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order; Comment: Order Amending the Briefing Schedule Concerning Spousal Privilege Issues - signed/SRK.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: Trace3, LLC,; Comment: Joint Case Management Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Application: Pro Hac Vice; Filed By: Timothy Cordell, Geoffrey Peterson, Devin Tomcik,; Comment: HRG 10/5/23 Megan M. Reilly's Verified Pro Hac Vice Application (Individual Defendants)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice; Filed By: Timothy Cordell, Geoffrey Peterson, Devin Tomcik,; Comment: HRG 10/5/23 Notice of Hearing on Megan M. Reilly's PHV Application (Indiv Defts)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order: Proposed; Filed By: Timothy Cordell, Geoffrey Peterson, Devin Tomcik,; Comment: HRG 10/5/23 PROPOSED Order Granting Megan M. Reilly's PHV Application (Indiv Defts)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
314 More Docket Entries
  • 05/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Motion: Seal; Filed By: Trace3, LLC,; Comment: HRG TBD Plaintiff's Application to Seal Documents submitted ISO its Ex Parte Application

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: In Support; Filed By: Trace3, LLC,; Comment: Danielle Rodriguez Declaration ISO Plaintiff's Application to Seal Documents submitted ISO its Ex Parte Application

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice; Filed By: Trace3, LLC,; Comment: Plaintiff's Notice of Lodging Documents Under Seal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order: Proposed; Filed By: Trace3, LLC,; Comment: Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Application to Seal Ex Parte Application Documents

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order: Deeming Case Complex; Comment: Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline - signed/SRK.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Trace3, LLC,; Comment: Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Lawsuit Notice; Comment: Civil Lawsuit Notice * 1st CMC set for 9/14/23 at 2:30pm in D1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Trace3, LLC,; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet * Complex

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Trace3, LLC,; Comment: Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less