This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 11/05/2023 at 18:02:46 (UTC).

Pshatoia LaRose vs Apple Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/06/2023 Pshatoia LaRose filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Apple Inc. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1956

  • Filing Date:

    09/06/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Pshatoia LaRose

Defendant

Apple Inc.

Not Classified By Court

Superior Court of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara

 

Court Documents

Amended Complaint Filed - No Fee

9/6/2023 Amended Complaint Filed - No Fee

Order: Proposed

9/6/2023 Order: Proposed

Summons: Issued/Filed

9/6/2023 Summons: Issued/Filed

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

9/6/2023 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/6/2023 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order: Deeming Case Not Complex

9/8/2023 Order: Deeming Case Not Complex

Clerk Rejection Letter

9/8/2023 Clerk Rejection Letter

Clerk Rejection Letter

9/11/2023 Clerk Rejection Letter

Ex Parte Application - Notice Required

10/12/2023 Ex Parte Application - Notice Required

Order: Ex Parte

10/16/2023 Order: Ex Parte

 

Docket Entries

02/20/2024

HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 3; Time: 4:00PM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Order: Ex Parte; Comment: RE: Motion for Jury Trial, EFS 10/16/23 DP

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Ex Parte Application - Notice Required; Filed By: Pshatoia LaRose,; Comment: Motion for Jury Trial with Emergency Ex Parte Court Order Trial Hearing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Clerk Rejection Letter; Filed By: Pshatoia LaRose,; Comment: Filing missing signature. You may submit again through E File Serve or during Ex Parte Hours 8:15am to 9:00AM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Clerk Rejection Letter; Filed By: Pshatoia LaRose,; Comment: Ex parte application is being rejected because we require a proposed order with the application.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Order: Deeming Case Not Complex; Comment: Order Deeming Case Not Complex - signed/SRK.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023

DocketDescription: New Filed Case

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Pshatoia LaRose,

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Pshatoia LaRose,

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Pshatoia LaRose,

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023

DocketDescription: Fee Waiver Application; Filed By: Pshatoia LaRose,

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Amended Complaint Filed - No Fee; Filed By: Pshatoia LaRose,; Comment: FAC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Fee Waiver Order-Grant; Filed By: Pshatoia LaRose,

[+] Read More [-] Read Less