This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 09/17/2023 at 01:00:47 (UTC).

STANFORD HEALTH CARE, a California non profit public benefit corporation vs WESTERN GROWERS ASSURANCE TRUST, a voluntary employees benefit association

Case Summary

On 05/19/2023 STANFORD HEALTH CARE, a California non profit public benefit corporation filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against WESTERN GROWERS ASSURANCE TRUST, a voluntary employees benefit association. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6483

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STANFORD HEALTH CARE, a California non profit public benefit corporation

Defendant

WESTERN GROWERS ASSURANCE TRUST, a voluntary employees benefit association

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Karlene Jasmine Rogers-Aberman

Defendant Attorney

Joseph C Campo

 

Court Documents

Summons: Issued/Filed

5/19/2023 Summons: Issued/Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/19/2023 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

5/19/2023 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

7/31/2023 Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

8/14/2023 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2023
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 20; Time: 3:00PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: STANFORD HEALTH CARE, a California non profit public benefit corporation,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: WESTERN GROWERS ASSURANCE TRUST, a voluntary employees benefit association ,; Comment: To Complaint Atty: Campo

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: STANFORD HEALTH CARE, a California non profit public benefit corporation,; Comment: Complaint for 1. Breach of Implied-in-Fact Contract and 2. Quantum Meruit

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: STANFORD HEALTH CARE, a California non profit public benefit corporation,; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: STANFORD HEALTH CARE, a California non profit public benefit corporation,; Comment: Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less