This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 11/23/2020 at 18:07:06 (UTC).

CAROLYN WONG vs ERIKA MATTSON et al

Case Summary

On 09/24/2020 CAROLYN WONG filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ERIKA MATTSON. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mikkelsen, Laurie. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0783

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Mikkelsen, Laurie

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WONG, CAROLYN JANIS

Defendants

MATTSON, RACHEL

MATTSON, ERIKA PAIGE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Coleman, Shelley Lee

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketConference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Mikkelsen, Laurie; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketClerk Rejection Letter - Comment: Please complete the proof of service (page 2) of your notice of settlement form (mandatory form).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketProof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: Proof of Service of Summons Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketProof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: Proof of Service of Summons Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketDemand - Comment: FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketSummons: Issued/Filed - Comment: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet - Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketComplaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketAdvance jury fee (Nonrefundable) - Comment: $150.00 jury fee deposited for Plaintiff paid for by Atty Coleman

    Read MoreRead Less