This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 01/16/2021 at 06:54:06 (UTC).

Caroline Cook vs David Trudell

Case Summary

On 11/30/2020 Caroline Cook filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against David Trudell. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mikkelsen, Laurie. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3663

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Mikkelsen, Laurie

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Caroline M Cook

Cook, Caroline M

Defendant

Trudell, David W

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketConference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Mikkelsen, Laurie; Hearing Time: 2:15 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketProof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketProof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketProof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketFee Waiver Order-Grant - Comment: GRANTED by Judge Kulkarni

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketFee Waiver Application

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketSummons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketComplaint (Limited): >$10K and <$25K

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketPetition (Limited): >$10K and <$25K

    Read MoreRead Less