This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 03/10/2023 at 18:04:50 (UTC).

Carney v. Wireless Advocates LLC, et al. (Class Action)

Case Summary

On 01/09/2023 Carney filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Wireless Advocates LLC, Class Action. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******9697

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brian Carney

Defendant

Wireless Advocates LLC

Not Yet Classified

Dan Brettler

Car Toys, Inc.

Not Classified By Court

Superior Court of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Marcus Joseph Bradley

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara

 

Court Documents

Civil Lawsuit Notice

1/9/2023 Civil Lawsuit Notice

Summons: Issued/Filed

1/9/2023 Summons: Issued/Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/9/2023 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

1/9/2023 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Order: Deeming Case Complex

1/11/2023 Order: Deeming Case Complex

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

2/8/2023 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

2/8/2023 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

2/10/2023 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2023
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 19; Time: 2:30PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Brian Carney,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint (Proof of Service)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Brian Carney,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint (Proof of Service)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Brian Carney,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint (Proof of Service)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order: Deeming Case Complex; Comment: Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline - signed/PML.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Brian Carney,; Comment: Class Action Complaint + Complex Fee paid by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Brian Carney,; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet * Complex * Class Action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Brian Carney,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Lawsuit Notice; Comment: 1st CMC set for 5/17/23 at 2:30pm

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less