This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 03/10/2023 at 08:59:23 (UTC).

Carleen Whittelsey vs Hopkins & Carley et al

Case Summary

On 06/22/2021 Carleen Whittelsey filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against Hopkins Carley. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4630

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Carleen Whittelsey

Defendants

Hopkins & Carley

Bruce B. Roberts

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Diane C. Deckard

Defendant Attorneys

Jonathan William Hughes

Bruce Douglas MacLeod

Sean M SeLegue

 

Court Documents

Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear

5/25/2023 Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear

Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear

5/25/2023 Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear

Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear

5/25/2023 Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear

Review: Case Status

2/2/2023 Review: Case Status

Review: Case Status

2/2/2023 Review: Case Status

Review: Case Status

2/2/2023 Review: Case Status

Review: Case Status

9/8/2022 Review: Case Status

Minute Order

2/2/2023 Minute Order

Minute Order

9/9/2022 Minute Order

Notice

10/25/2021 Notice

Clerk Rejection Letter

6/22/2021 Clerk Rejection Letter

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

6/22/2021 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/22/2021 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons: Issued/Filed

7/29/2021 Summons: Issued/Filed

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

10/5/2021 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

10/5/2021 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

10/19/2021 Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Statement: Case Management Conference

10/25/2021 Statement: Case Management Conference

57 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear; Department: Department 10; Time: 10:00AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Review: Case Status; Department: Department 10; Time: 10:00AM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Review: Case Status; Department: Department 19; Time: 10:00AM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Entry of Order; Filed By: Hopkins & Carley, Bruce Roberts,; Comment: Notice of Entry of Order Denying Motion for Order Disqualifying Opposing Counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Further Case Management; Department: Department 19; Time: 10:00AM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Motion: Order; Department: Department 19; Time: 9:00AM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
44 More Docket Entries
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice; Filed By: Hopkins & Carley, Bruce Roberts,; Comment: re: Deposit of Jury Fees

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: Hopkins & Carley, Bruce Roberts,; Comment: Case Management Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Hopkins & Carley, Bruce Roberts,; Comment: to complaint, atty MacLeod

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Carleen Whittelsey,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Carleen Whittelsey,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Carleen Whittelsey,; Comment: Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Carleen Whittelsey,; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Carleen Whittelsey,; Comment: Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Clerk Rejection Letter; Filed By: Carleen Whittelsey,; Comment: #6700120 - Bruce B. Roberts name on summons does not match name on the complaint.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less