This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/17/2019 at 15:28:03 (UTC).

Carl England vs Brianne England

Case Summary

On 02/03/2016 Carl England filed a Family - Legal Separation lawsuit against Brianne England. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Joseph, Irwin and Huber, Joseph H.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************2454

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Legal Separation

  • Courthouse:

    Family Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Joseph, Irwin

Huber, Joseph H.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Carl J England

Morgan Hill, CA 95037

Petitioner

England, Carl J

Claimants

City of San Jose Deferred Compensation Plan

San Jose Police and Fire Department Retirement Plan

Defendant

Brianne England

Respondent

England, Brianne

Minors

England, Zoe

England, Nicholas

England, Mason

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Lurkis, Clifton Jon

Respondent Attorney

Luca, Dennis James

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2018
  • Stipulation and Order - Comment: mod of visitation and mod of c/s, s/s

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • Order: Income Withholding for Support

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • Notice: Entry of Judgment w/POS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • Judgment: Status Only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • Stipulation & Order - No Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • Request for Order: Other w/fee - Judicial Officer: Huber, Joseph H.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Matter Heard; Comment: (r) atty fees, other: (1) smith/ostler true-up, (2) payment retroactive to original file date, (3) bifurcation of marital status-pjn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • Substitution: Attorney - Comment: Substitution of Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • Proof of Service: Mail - Comment: POS; HRG 6/21/18; Responsive Dec to RFO; I & E Dec; Sub of Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • Proof of Service: Electronic - Comment: POS; HRG 6/21/18; Responsive Dec to RFO; I & E Dec; Sub of Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
53 More Docket Entries
  • 02/03/2016
  • Bulk Scanned Documents - Comment: Bulk Scan 11-26-14 to 12-24-14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2016
  • Petition: 300 / Amended - Comment: ok to file per Stip and order filed 2/3/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2016
  • Stipulation and Order - Comment: leave to amend petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2014
  • Declaration: Under UCCJEA - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl:Uniform Custody Act Decision = M Closed = 12/24/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2014
  • Response: Dissolution - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Response DS/NL/LS Decision = M Closed = 12/24/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2014
  • Proof of Service of Summons Filed - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Text = ADR Options,Family Law Notice, Child Custody & Visitation Application Attachment Legacy Name = FL Proof of Svc/Summons Decision = M Closed = 11/26/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2014
  • Declaration: Under UCCJEA - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl:Uniform Custody Act Decision = M Closed = 11/26/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2014
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Summons Decision = M Closed = 11/26/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2014
  • Petition: Legal Separation w/minor - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Petn:Legal Sep/Minor Decision = M Closed = 11/26/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2014
  • Declaration: Residence - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl of Residence Decision = M Closed = 11/26/2014

    Read MoreRead Less