This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 01/18/2023 at 11:58:42 (UTC).

Card v. Security Industry Specialists, Inc. (Class Action)

Case Summary

On 10/28/2022 Card filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Security Industry Specialists, Inc Class Action. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5652

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jason Card

Defendant

SECURITY INDUSTRY SPECIALISTS, INC, a California corporation

Not Classified By Court

Superior Court of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David Lavi

Defendant Attorney

Billie Desiree Wenter

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara

 

Court Documents

Notice: Appearance

11/17/2022 Notice: Appearance

Order: Deeming Case Complex

11/1/2022 Order: Deeming Case Complex

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

10/28/2022 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/28/2022 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons: Issued/Filed

10/28/2022 Summons: Issued/Filed

Notice: Appearance

11/17/2022 Notice: Appearance

Order: Deeming Case Complex

11/1/2022 Order: Deeming Case Complex

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

10/28/2022 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/28/2022 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons: Issued/Filed

10/28/2022 Summons: Issued/Filed

Notice: Appearance

11/17/2022 Notice: Appearance

Order: Deeming Case Complex

11/1/2022 Order: Deeming Case Complex

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

10/28/2022 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/28/2022 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons: Issued/Filed

10/28/2022 Summons: Issued/Filed

Order: Deeming Case Complex

11/1/2022 Order: Deeming Case Complex

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

10/28/2022 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/28/2022 Civil Case Cover Sheet

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2023
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 1; Time: 2:30PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Appearance; Filed By: SECURITY INDUSTRY SPECIALISTS, INC, a California corporation,; Comment: Notice of Appearance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order: Deeming Case Complex; Comment: Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline - signed/SRK.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Jason Card,; Comment: Class Action Complaint + Complex Fee paid by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Jason Card,; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet * Complex * Class Action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Jason Card,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SECURITY INDUSTRY SPECIALISTS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Superior Court of California is a litigant