This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 19:52:02 (UTC).

Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. vs Nermin Avdic

Case Summary

On 04/04/2018 Capital One Bank USA , N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Nermin Avdic. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kirwan, Peter. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6115

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kirwan, Peter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.

Defendant

Avdic, nermin

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bleier, Elizabeth A.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Judgment Type: Clerk Default Judgment (CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.; Judgment Amount: $3,553.91; Awarded Against: Avdic, Nermin; Party: Names: Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.; Avdic, Nermin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • Abstract of Judgment: Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • Judgment: Default - Comment: $3,553.91

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • Declaration - Comment: RE: NONMILITARY STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • Declaration: CCP 1033

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • Declaration: CCP 585

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • Dismissal - Comment: DOES 1-5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: AGAINST: NERMIN AVDIC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • Default Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Declaration - Comment: of non-military status

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Complaint (Limited): Up to $10K

    Read MoreRead Less