This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/19/2019 at 17:04:21 (UTC).

Capital One Bank (USA) N.A. vs L. Latimer

Case Summary

On 04/05/2010 Capital One Bank USA N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against L Latimer. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Toff, Ronald I. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************4844

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Toff, Ronald I

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Capital One Bank (Usa) N.A.

Defendants

Lori A Latimer

Latimer, Lori A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Janalie A. Henriques

151 Bernal Road, Suite 8

San Jose, CA 95119-1306

Henriques, Janalie A.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2010
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Clerk Default Judgment (CV); Party: Name: Latimer, Lori A; Party: Name: Capital One Bank (USA) N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2010
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Judge, Inactive; Judgment Type: Clerk Default Judgment (CV); Party: Name: Latimer, Lori A; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Capital One Bank (USA) N.A.; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=F; Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Capital One Bank (USA) N.A.; Judgment Amount: $5,789.91; And Attorney Fees: $0.00; Awarded Against: Latimer, Lori A; Amount; Pre-Judgment Interest: $0.00; Costs: $309.00; Other: $5,480.91; Total: $5789.91; Comment: clerkid=319; printdate=Aug 31 2010; freetext=Total Judgment $5,789.91; origjudgdate=Aug 31 2010; judgstatusdate=Aug 31 2010; judgstatus=Entered; casetype=09LT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2015
  • Writ: Execution (Filed) - Judicial Officer: Toff, Ronald I; Comment: Text = Los Angeles, issued 10/22/13, deficit - $8,272.68 Legacy Name = CV Return on Writ fr Sheriff/Unsatis Decision = M Closed = 01/13/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2013
  • Writ: Execution (Filed) - Judicial Officer: Toff, Ronald I; Comment: Text = Los Angeles County $7,586.68 Legacy Name = CV Writ of Execution Issued Decision = M Closed = 10/22/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2013
  • Memorandum of Costs - Judicial Officer: Toff, Ronald I; Comment: Text = costs $60.00 credit $0.00 interest $1711.77 Legacy Name = CV Memo of Costs/After Jgmt Decision = M Closed = 10/22/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2013
  • Writ: Execution (Filed) - Judicial Officer: Toff, Ronald I; Comment: Text = Santa Clara, issued 11/21/11 Legacy Name = CV Writ of Exec Retn/Unsatis Decision = M Closed = 08/22/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2011
  • Writ: Execution (Issued) - Judicial Officer: Toff, Ronald I; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Writ of Exec Issued to SCC Decision = M Closed = 11/21/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2010
  • Abstract of Judgment: Issued - Judicial Officer: Toff, Ronald I; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Abstract of Judgment Issued Decision = M Closed = 09/10/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2010
  • Judgment: Default - Judicial Officer: Toff, Ronald I; Comment: Text = Total Judgment $5,789.91 Legacy Name = CV Judgment After Default Decision = M Closed = 08/31/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2010
  • Declaration - Judicial Officer: Toff, Ronald I; Comment: Text = Re: waiver of interest, atty fees and costs (1033) and waiver of atty fees Legacy Name = CV Declaration Decision = M Closed = 08/31/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2010
  • Request: Enter Default - Judicial Officer: Toff, Ronald I; Comment: Text = costs $309.00 Legacy Name = CV Req:Entry of Default Decision = M Closed = 08/31/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2010
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Judicial Officer: Toff, Ronald I; Comment: Text = personal Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 06/17/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2010
  • Declaration: Non-Service - Judicial Officer: Toff, Ronald I; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Decl:Non-Service Decision = M Closed = 04/22/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2010
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet - Judicial Officer: Toff, Ronald I; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Case Cover Sheet Decision = M Closed = 04/05/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2010
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Judicial Officer: Toff, Ronald I; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Summons Filed Decision = M Closed = 04/05/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2010
  • Complaint (Limited): Up to $10K - Judicial Officer: Toff, Ronald I; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Complaint Filed/Summs Iss <$10k Decision = M Closed = 04/05/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HENRIQUES JANALIE