This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 12:28:30 (UTC).

Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. vs Jennifer Hornback

Case Summary

On 01/16/2018 Capital One Bank USA , N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Jennifer Hornback. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Stoelker, James L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1824

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Stoelker, James L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.

Defendant

Hornback, Jennifer L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kennard, Robert S.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Stoelker, James L; Judgment Type: Dismissal - No ADR (CV); Party: Names: Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.; Hornback, Jennifer L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • Request: Dismissal, Entire Action With Prejudice - Comment: Request for Dismissal with prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Complaint (Limited): Up to $10K

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less