Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 06:37:21 (UTC).

Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. vs Connie Siller

Case Summary

On 07/26/2018 Capital One Bank USA , N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Connie Siller. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2288

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.

Defendant

Siller, Connie A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Henriques, Janalie Ann

Defendant Attorney

Apps, Stanley R.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2019
  • Order - Comment: Granting Order on Settlement Agreement and Stipulation by Judge Kirwan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • Request: Dismissal - Comment: Request For Dismissal Per 664.6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • Notice - Comment: RE: SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • Request - Comment: At Issue Memorandum For Trial Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • Answer (Limited): Up to $10K - Comment: Atty. Apps

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Comment: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet - Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • Complaint (Limited): Up to $10K - Comment: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less