This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 07:28:43 (UTC).

Capital One Bank (USA) N.A. vs J. Rothwell

Case Summary

On 04/14/2010 Capital One Bank USA N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against J Rothwell. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Cunningham, Ray E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************4888

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Cunningham, Ray E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Capital One Bank (Usa) N.A.

Defendants

James Rothwell

Rothwell, James

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mark D. Walsh

5030 Camino De La Siesta, Suite 340

San Diego, CA 92108

Walsh, Mark D.

Henriques, Janalie Ann

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2010
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court (CV); Party: Name: Rothwell, James; Party: Name: Capital One Bank (USA) N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2010
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Cunningham, Ray E; Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court (CV); Party: Name: Rothwell, James; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Capital One Bank (USA) N.A.; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=F; Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Capital One Bank (USA) N.A.; Judgment Amount: $4,035.70; And Attorney Fees: $747.98; Awarded Against: Rothwell, James; Amount; Pre-Judgment Interest: $482.98; Costs: $398.50; Other: $3,154.22; Total: $4035.70; Comment: printdate=Aug 19 2010; freetext=Total Judgment $4,783.68; origjudgdate=Aug 18 2010; judgstatusdate=Aug 19 2010; judgstatus=Entered; casetype=09LT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • Substitution: Attorney - Comment: OLD : WALSH NEW : HENRIQUES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • Writ: Execution (Filed) - Comment: 03/10/14, Los Angeles, Unsatisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • Writ: Execution (Filed)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2015
  • Abstract of Judgment: Issued - Judicial Officer: Cunningham, Ray E; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Abstract of Judgment Issued Decision = M Closed = 10/16/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2015
  • Writ: Execution (Issued) - Judicial Officer: Cunningham, Ray E; Comment: Text = $3448.01 Legacy Name = CV Writ of Exec Issued to SCC Decision = M Closed = 07/07/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2015
  • Memorandum of Costs - Judicial Officer: Cunningham, Ray E; Comment: Text = Total:$335.00, Credit:$1695.67, Mail Date: 06/10/15 Legacy Name = CV Memo of Costs/After Jgmt Decision = M Closed = 07/07/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2015
  • Writ: Execution (Filed) - Judicial Officer: Cunningham, Ray E; Comment: Text = PARTIALLY SATISFIED - Los Angeles, issued 3/10/14, deficit - $5,677.69 Legacy Name = CV Return on Writ fr Sheriff/Unsatis Decision = M Closed = 01/13/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2014
  • Writ: Execution (Filed) - Judicial Officer: Cunningham, Ray E; Comment: Text = Los Angeles $6,561.86 Legacy Name = CV Writ of Execution Issued Decision = M Closed = 03/10/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 08/17/2010
  • Declaration: Supplemental - Judicial Officer: Cunningham, Ray E; Comment: Text = (ccp 585d) Legacy Name = CV Supplemental Declaration Decision = M Closed = 08/17/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2010
  • Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Cunningham, Ray E; Comment: Text = As to Does 1 to 10 only Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Partial W/O Prej Decision = M Closed = 08/17/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2010
  • Request: Enter Default - Judicial Officer: Cunningham, Ray E; Comment: Text = costs $398.50 Legacy Name = CV Req:Entry of Default Decision = M Closed = 08/17/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2010
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Judicial Officer: Cunningham, Ray E; Comment: Text = personal Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 06/11/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2010
  • Declaration: Non-Service - Judicial Officer: Cunningham, Ray E; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Decl:Non-Service Decision = M Closed = 05/18/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2010
  • Declaration: Non-Service - Judicial Officer: Cunningham, Ray E; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Decl:Non-Service Decision = M Closed = 04/29/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2010
  • Affidavit - Judicial Officer: Cunningham, Ray E; Comment: Text = of venue Legacy Name = CV Affidavit Decision = M Closed = 04/14/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2010
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet - Judicial Officer: Cunningham, Ray E; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Case Cover Sheet Decision = M Closed = 04/14/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2010
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Judicial Officer: Cunningham, Ray E; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Summons Filed Decision = M Closed = 04/14/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2010
  • Complaint (Limited): Up to $10K - Judicial Officer: Cunningham, Ray E; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Complaint Filed/Summs Iss <$10k Decision = M Closed = 04/14/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEGAL RECOVERY LAW OFFICES INC. - MARK D. WALSH

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HENRIQUES JANALIE