This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 01/06/2022 at 16:22:35 (UTC).

Candelaria Barajas vs Abbott Laboratories, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/06/2017 Candelaria Barajas filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Abbott Laboratories, Inc. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Stoelker, James L. The case status is Other - Transferred.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6947

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Stoelker, James L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Candelaria Barajas

Defendant

Abbott Laboratories, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Baker, Robert David

Robert David Baker

Defendant Attorneys

Nicole Ann Bolson

Bolson, Nicole Ann

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

2/13/2018 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Removal to Federal Court

2/8/2018 Removal to Federal Court

Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

2/7/2018 Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Minute Order

1/23/2018 Minute Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/6/2017 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

10/6/2017 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Summons: Issued/Filed

10/6/2017 Summons: Issued/Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Candelaria Barajas, Abbott Laboratories, Inc.,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Removal to Federal Court; Filed By: Abbott Laboratories, Inc.,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • DocketDescription: Restored to court's control; Comment: **JIBSIS Entry Only**

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Abbott Laboratories, Inc.,; Comment: To complaint; Atty Baarts

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 13; Time: 2:15PM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • DocketDescription: Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable); Filed By: Candelaria Barajas,; Comment: $150.00 jury fee paid for Plaintiff Candelaria Barajas by Atty Baker

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less