This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 01/22/2022 at 10:10:20 (UTC).

California School Employees Association vs Vi Tran et al

Case Summary

On 06/20/2019 California School Employees Association filed an Other lawsuit against Vi Tran. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0251

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

California School Employees Association

Defendants

Vi Q Tran

Chung (Chris) Ha

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Andrew Joseph Kahn

Defendant Attorney

Hunter Pyle

 

Court Documents

Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS

12/12/2019 Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS

Request: Dismissal

12/2/2019 Request: Dismissal

Minute Order

10/2/2019 Minute Order

Statement: Case Management Conference

9/16/2019 Statement: Case Management Conference

Statement: Case Management Conference

9/12/2019 Statement: Case Management Conference

Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

8/14/2019 Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

8/14/2019 Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

8/7/2019 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

8/7/2019 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/9/2019 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Clerk Rejection Letter

7/8/2019 Clerk Rejection Letter

Summons: Issued/Filed

6/20/2019 Summons: Issued/Filed

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

6/20/2019 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS; Filed By: California School Employees Association,; Comment: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Request: Dismissal; Filed By: California School Employees Association,; Comment: entire with prejudice by atty Kahn

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 19; Time: 3:00PM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketDescription: Referral: Mediation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: Vi Tran, Chung (Chris) Ha,; Comment: Defendants' Case Management Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: California School Employees Association,; Comment: Case Management Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Vi Tran,; Comment: To complaint; Atty Pyle

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Chung (Chris) Ha,; Comment: To complaint; Atty Pyle

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: California School Employees Association,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: California School Employees Association,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: California School Employees Association,; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Clerk Rejection Letter; Filed By: California School Employees Association,; Comment: Envelope #03032026, item 1 on the civil case cover sheet is incomplete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: California School Employees Association,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: California School Employees Association,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less