This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 12:28:16 (UTC).

Silicon Valley Self Direct, Inc. vs Restoration Specialists, Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/16/2018 Silicon Valley Self Direct, Inc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Restoration Specialists, Inc. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Copeland, Christine. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2558

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Copeland, Christine

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

California Labor Force

Silicon Valley Self Direct, Inc.

Defendant

Restoration Specialists, Inc.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Request for Dismissal (PR, SC); Comment: Comment (Plt filed dismissal without prejudice. Claim not served.); Party: Names: California Labor Force; Restoration Specialists, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Judicial Officer: Copeland, Christine; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Held; Comment: Fees paid $45.00. - No POS as of 02/21/18.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • Request: Dismissal, Entire Action Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • Certified Mail Returned Unclaimed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Service by clerk for certified mail, to each defendant - Comment: #70170530000076918877.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim-$1,500 or Less

    Read MoreRead Less