This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 12:28:18 (UTC).

California Labor Force vs American Enteprise of San Francisco

Case Summary

On 01/16/2018 California Labor Force filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against American Enteprise of San Francisco. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Copeland, Christine. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2559

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Copeland, Christine

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

California Labor Force

Defendant

American Enteprise of San Francisco

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Request for Dismissal (PR, SC); Comment: Comment (Plt filed dismissal without prejudice. Claim not served.); Party: Names: California Labor Force; American Enteprise of San Francisco

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Judicial Officer: Copeland, Christine; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Held; Comment: Fee Paid $65.00 - No POS as of 00/21/18.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • Request: Dismissal, Entire Action Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • Certified Mail Returned Unclaimed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Service by clerk for certified mail, to each defendant - Comment: #70170530000076919119

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim-$1,501 to $5,000

    Read MoreRead Less