This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 01/19/2022 at 05:48:37 (UTC).

CALIFORNIA INSURANCE COMPANY vs DANIEL L MARKS INC DBA MARINA PLUMBING

Case Summary

On 07/18/2018 CALIFORNIA INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against DANIEL L MARKS INC DBA MARINA PLUMBING. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1865

  • Filing Date:

    07/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CALIFORNIA INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

DANIEL L MARKS INC DBA MARINA PLUMBING

DANIEL L MARKS INC

MARINA PLUMBING

SUN LIGHT & POWER

Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

ROEM BUILDERS, INC.

SUN LIGHT & POWER

MOES 1 TO 100

Not Yet Classified, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

SUN LIGHT & POWER

DANIEL L MARKS INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Eric Marshall Schroeder

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Joyce, Shaun W

Broghammer, John Duffy

Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

Broghammer, John Duffy

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

John D. Broghammer

Shaun W Joyce

 

Court Documents

Hearing: Dismissal after settlement

1/7/2021 Hearing: Dismissal after settlement

Hearing: Dismissal after settlement

1/7/2021 Hearing: Dismissal after settlement

Hearing: Dismissal after settlement

1/7/2021 Hearing: Dismissal after settlement

Hearing: Dismissal after settlement

1/7/2021 Hearing: Dismissal after settlement

Summons: Issued/Filed

7/18/2018 Summons: Issued/Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/18/2018 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

7/18/2018 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

9/18/2018 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Cross-Complaint

10/29/2018 Cross-Complaint

Summons: Issued/Filed

10/29/2018 Summons: Issued/Filed

Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

10/29/2018 Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Errata

11/8/2018 Errata

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

3/21/2019 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Request: Dismissal

12/1/2020 Request: Dismissal

Request: Dismissal

12/10/2020 Request: Dismissal

Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS

12/16/2020 Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS

Request: Dismissal

1/6/2021 Request: Dismissal

Minute Order

1/7/2021 Minute Order

44 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Hearing: Dismissal after settlement; Department: Department 8; Time: 10:00AM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Request: Dismissal; Filed By: SUN LIGHT & POWER,; Comment: Request for Dismissal of Cross-Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS; Filed By: CALIFORNIA INSURANCE COMPANY,; Comment: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Request: Dismissal; Filed By: DANIEL L MARKS INC,; Comment: Partial, With Prejudice, as to the Cross-Complaint filed on 10-28-18 ONLY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Request: Dismissal; Filed By: CALIFORNIA INSURANCE COMPANY,; Comment: Partial, With Prejudice, as to the Complaint ONLY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Hearing: Dismissal after settlement; Department: Department 8; Time: 10:00AM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement; Filed By: CALIFORNIA INSURANCE COMPANY,; Comment: Statement re: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Settlement; Filed By: CALIFORNIA INSURANCE COMPANY,; Comment: Notice of Settlement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: DANIEL L MARKS INC, SUN LIGHT & POWER,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Errata; Filed By: DANIEL L MARKS INC,; Comment: Ntc of Errata to Cross Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Cross-Complaint; Filed By: DANIEL L MARKS INC, ROEM BUILDERS, INC., SUN LIGHT & POWER,; Comment: **DISMISSAL Filed 12-10-20** Atty Joyce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: DANIEL L MARKS INC, ROEM BUILDERS, INC., SUN LIGHT & POWER,; Comment: on Cross Complaint.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: DANIEL L MARKS INC,; Comment: Answer to Complaint. Atty Stone

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: CALIFORNIA INSURANCE COMPANY, DANIEL L MARKS INC,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: CALIFORNIA INSURANCE COMPANY,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: CALIFORNIA INSURANCE COMPANY,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: CALIFORNIA INSURANCE COMPANY,; Comment: **DISMISSAL Filed 12-01-20**

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SUN LIGHT & POWER is a litigant

Latest cases where Roem Builders, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where California Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John D Broghammer