This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/25/2019 at 12:40:20 (UTC).

CACH, LLC vs L. Frausto

Case Summary

On 03/07/2014 CACH, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against L Frausto. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Nadler, Jerome S and Lucas, Patricia M. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************8073

  • Filing Date:

    03/07/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Nadler, Jerome S

Lucas, Patricia M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cach, Llc

Defendants

Luz Frausto

Frausto, Luz V

Frausto, Luz

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Deborah S. Harvego

2277 Fair Oaks Blvd., Suite 305A

Sacramento, CA 95825

Harvego, Deborah S.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2014
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Clerk Default Judgment (CV); Party: Name: Frausto, Luz; Party: Name: CACH, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2014
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Lucas, Patricia M; Judgment Type: Clerk Default Judgment (CV); Party: Name: Frausto, Luz; Comment: dispositiveflag=NO;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: CACH, LLC; Comment: dispositiveflag=NO;foragainstcode=F; Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: CACH, LLC; Judgment Amount: $4,127.89; And Attorney Fees: $0.00; Awarded Against: Frausto, Luz; Amount; Pre-Judgment Interest: $0.00; Costs: $0.00; Other: $4,127.89; Total: $4127.89; Comment: printdate=Dec 2 2014; freetext=total judgment: $4127.89; possessionflag=0; printpartiesflag=1; origjudgdate=Dec 2 2014; judgstatusdate=Dec 2 2014; judgstatus=Entered; casetype=09LT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • Writ: Execution (Filed) - Comment: Santa Cruz : Unsatisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • Writ: Execution (Issued) - Comment: SANTA CRUZ $6197.91

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • Memorandum of Costs - Comment: Costs: $420; Interest: $13.50 ; Interest: $1,638.52 ; Mailing: 11/5/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • Notice: Change Address/Firm Name

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • Memorandum of Costs - Comment: Cost: $420; credit: $13.50; interest: $705.65; date of mailing: 8/19/16. Atty Zarco.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2015
  • Writ: Execution (Filed) - Judicial Officer: Lucas, Patricia M; Comment: Text = Los Angeles Co $4251.28 Legacy Name = CV Writ of Execution Issued Decision = M Closed = 03/25/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2015
  • Writ: Execution (Filed) - Judicial Officer: Lucas, Patricia M; Comment: Text = Sacramento Co $4251.28 Legacy Name = CV Writ of Execution Issued Decision = M Closed = 03/25/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2015
  • Memorandum of Costs - Judicial Officer: Lucas, Patricia M; Comment: Text = Interest $98.39 Atty Watkins Legacy Name = CV Memo of Costs/After Jgmt Decision = M Closed = 03/25/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/25/2015
  • Notice: Entry of Order - Judicial Officer: Lucas, Patricia M; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Entry of Order Decision = M Closed = 03/25/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2014
  • Judgment: Default - Judicial Officer: Lucas, Patricia M; Comment: Text = total judgment: $4127.89 Legacy Name = CV Judgment After Default Decision = M Closed = 12/02/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2014
  • Declaration: CCP 1033 - Judicial Officer: Lucas, Patricia M; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Decl:CCP1033 Decision = M Closed = 12/02/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2014
  • Default Entered - Judicial Officer: Lucas, Patricia M; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Default Entered Decision = M Closed = 12/02/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2014
  • Notice: Reassignment of Case - Judicial Officer: Lucas, Patricia M; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Reassignment of Case Decision = M Closed = 10/03/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2014
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Judicial Officer: Nadler, Jerome S; Comment: Text = personal Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 10/02/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2014
  • Declaration: Non-Service - Judicial Officer: Nadler, Jerome S; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Decl:Non-Service Decision = M Closed = 04/15/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2014
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet - Judicial Officer: Nadler, Jerome S; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Case Cover Sheet Decision = M Closed = 03/07/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2014
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Judicial Officer: Nadler, Jerome S; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Summons Filed Decision = M Closed = 03/07/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2014
  • Complaint (Limited): Up to $10K - Judicial Officer: Nadler, Jerome S; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Complaint Filed/Summs Iss <$10k Decision = M Closed = 03/07/2014

    Read MoreRead Less