This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 02/28/2018 at 03:45:59 (UTC).

C. Li Vs Sesame Capital, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/12/2005 C Li filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Sesame Capital, Inc. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Larkin, Donald and Madden, James P. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************3023

  • Filing Date:

    12/12/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Larkin, Donald

Madden, James P

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Cindy Heichu Li

Union City, CA 94587

Li, Cindy Heichu

Defendants

Sesame Capital, Inc.

135 N Wolfe Rd #30

Sunnyvale, CA 94086

Jain, Pavana

Diagnostics Unlimited

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2006
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Jain, Pavana; Party: Name: Sesame Capital, Inc.; Party: Name: Li, Cindy Heichu

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2006
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Sesame Capital, Inc.; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=F; Party: Name: Li, Cindy Heichu; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=A; Judgment - Non-Monetary Award: Awarded To: Sesame Capital, Inc.; Awarded Against: Li, Cindy Heichu; Comment: printdate=Feb 10 2006; freetext=defendent does not owe plaintiff any money on plaintiff's claim.; origjudgdate=Feb 10 2006; judgstatusdate=Feb 10 2006; judgstatus=Entered; casetype=SCMN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2005
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Assigned, To Be; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Sesame Capital, Inc.; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Li, Cindy Heichu; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=F;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2006
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Heard: Judgment; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = JM - Madden, James Result Date = 02/10/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2006
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Larkin, Donald; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Off Calendar (before hearing); Comment: Result By = P Result Judge = JM - Madden, James Result Date = 12/16/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2005
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2005
  • Document: Other - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Addl Plts and Defs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2005
  • Defendant's Claim (Amended) (No change in claim amount) - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Amend Plaintiff's Claim Decision = M Closed = 12/16/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2005
  • Cause Of Action - Action Complaint; File Date: 12/12/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2005
  • Document: Other - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Addl Plts and Defs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2005
  • Plaintiff's Claim-$1,500 or Less - Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Plaintiff's Claim/<13,non-Gov Closed = 02/10/2006

    Read MoreRead Less