This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 03/10/2018 at 03:01:14 (UTC).

C. Enwere vs S. Balbaky

Case Summary

On 12/24/2009 C Enwere filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against S Balbaky. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Madden, James P. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************6787

  • Filing Date:

    12/24/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Madden, James P

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Cathy Enwere

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Enwere, Cathy

Defendants

Sarah Balbaky

Los Gatos, CA 95030

Balbaky, Sarah

Windsor Apartments

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2010
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Balbaky, Sarah; Party: Name: Enwere, Cathy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2010
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Balbaky, Sarah; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=F; Party: Name: Enwere, Cathy; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=A; Judgment - Non-Monetary Award: Awarded To: Balbaky, Sarah; Awarded Against: Enwere, Cathy; Comment: printdate=Feb 2 2010; freetext=defendent does not owe plaintiff any money on plaintiff's claim.; origjudgdate=Feb 1 2010; judgstatusdate=Feb 2 2010; judgstatus=Entered; casetype=SCMN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2009
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Assigned, To Be; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Balbaky, Sarah; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Enwere, Cathy; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=F;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2010
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Heard: Judgment; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = JM - Madden, James Result Date = 02/01/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2010
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc of Subpoena

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2010
  • Declaration - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Decl:Subpoena Duces Tecum Decision = M Closed = 01/19/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2010
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc of Subpoena

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2010
  • Declaration - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Decl:Subpoena Duces Tecum Decision = M Closed = 01/13/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2010
  • Declaration - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Decl:Subpoena Duces Tecum Decision = M Closed = 01/13/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2010
  • Declaration - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Decl:Subpoena Duces Tecum Decision = M Closed = 01/13/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2010
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2009
  • Fee Waiver Order-Grant - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = fee waiver granted in whole by judge thang nguyen barrett. plaintiff notified by mail Legacy Name = SC Ord:Appl/Waiver of Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2009
  • Cause Of Action - Action Complaint; File Date: 12/24/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2009
  • Fee Waiver Application - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Appl:Waiver of Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2009
  • Plaintiff's Claim-$1,501 to $5,000 - Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Plaintiff Claim $1501-$5000 Decision = M Closed = 02/02/2010

    Read MoreRead Less