Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/24/2019 at 15:28:20 (UTC).

Alexander V. Sunnyvale Park Partners, LLC

Case Summary

On 07/31/2013 Alexander filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Sunnyvale Park Partners, LLC. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Stoelker, James L, McGowen, Beth, Kirwan, Peter, McKenney, Kevin E, Kuhnle, Thomas, Kleinberg, James P, Strickland, Elizabeth, Lucas, Patricia M and Folan, Maureen A. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************0396

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Stoelker, James L

McGowen, Beth

Kirwan, Peter

McKenney, Kevin E

Kuhnle, Thomas

Kleinberg, James P

Strickland, Elizabeth

Lucas, Patricia M

Folan, Maureen A

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

William B Young

Melissa Westlund

Cerres R Alexander

Juan Carlos Alvarado

David S Austin

Damaso Ayard

Maria Ayard

Roger Lee Bagley

Estella Ballesteros

Richard Ballesteros

Wu Jiang Bi

Diane K Burnham

Tracy L Callaway

Cheryl A Catron

Xiao Dong Chen

Maria Crowninshield

Sean Dechter

Linda Ann Derush

Adriana Dominguez

Arturo Dominguez

44 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Linda B. Reich

600 "B" Street, Suite 2400

San Diego, CA 92101-4508

Other Attorneys

Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara

Knopfler, George

Reich, Linda B.

 

Court Documents

Statement: Case Management Conference

00337357.pdf: Comment: (Joint)

Order

Order: Comment: Mandatory Settlement Conference reset from 11/2/16 to 11/1/16 at 9am in D1

Order

Order: Comment: Final Pretrial Conference reset from 10/26/16 to 10/25/16 at 9am in D1

Notice

Notice: Comment: Notice of Teleconference set for 8/9/16 at 10am

Order

Order: Comment: Order After Hearing on 7/29/16 [Motion by Defendants to Continue 11/7/16 Trial] - signed by Judge Peter H. Kirwan

Response/Reply

Reply to Opposition to Motion For Order Continuing Trial: Comment: Reply to Opposition to Motion For Order Continuing Trial

Affidavit

Declaration of George Knopfler in Support of Reply to Opposi: Comment: Declaration of George Knopfler in Support of Reply to Opposition to Motion

Notice of Motion

Notice of Motion: Comment: to Continue Trial

Complaint: Amended

2nd Amended Complaint: Judicial Officer: Lucas, Patricia M; Comment: Text = atty Linda Reich Legacy Name = CV 2nd Amended Complaint Decision = M Closed = 02/07/2014

Order

Order Case is Reassigned to Hon. Thomas E. Kuhnle: Comment: Order & Notice of Reassignment of Case to Hon. Thomas E. Kuhnle

Order

Order Excuses Certain Plaintiffs from 11-1-16 Mand Sett Con: Comment: Order Excusing the Attendance of Certain Plaintiffs at the 11/1/16 Mandatory Settlement Conference - signed by Judge Peter H. Kirwan

Application and Order

Pltfs' Applic for Order re Attend MSC.pdf: Comment: Pltfs' Applic for Order re Attend MSC + Proposed Order

Statement: Settlement Conference

Pltfs' Sett Conf Statement (MSC) 10 26 16.pdf:

Proof of Service: Mail

POS 10 26 16 (sett conf stmnt).pdf:

Statement

Joint Pretrial Conf Stmnt 10-20-16.pdf: Comment: Joint Pretrial Conference Statement

Proof of Service: Electronic

POS 10 20 16 (jt pretrial conf stmnt).pdf:

Notice: Accept Offer to Compromise

Ntc. of Acc. of 998 Offer (00338848xACCB6).pdf: Comment: Notice of Acceptance of Offer to Compromise [CCP 998] Ramirez

Notice: Accept Offer to Compromise

Ntc of Acc. of 998 Offer (00338849xACCB6).pdf: Comment: Notice of Acceptance of Offer to Compromise [CCP 998] Austin

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2017
  • Conference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Kuhnle, Thomas; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: (Post Mediation Report)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Dismissal - Entire Action - Dismissal - Entire Action: Comment: with prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service: Mail - Proof of Service Mail: Comment: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice - Notice CMC set for 3-3-17 at 10am in D5: Comment: CMC set for 3/3/17 at 10am in D5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Order - Order Case is Reassigned to Hon. Thomas E. Kuhnle: Comment: Order & Notice of Reassignment of Case to Hon. Thomas E. Kuhnle

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2016
  • Jury Trial: Long Cause - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • Conference: Settlement Jury - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: Settlement Pro Tem is Brad Bening

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Order - Order Excuses Certain Plaintiffs from 11-1-16 Mand Sett Con: Comment: Order Excusing the Attendance of Certain Plaintiffs at the 11/1/16 Mandatory Settlement Conference - signed by Judge Peter H. Kirwan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Application and Order - Pltfs' Applic for Order re Attend MSC.pdf: Comment: Pltfs' Applic for Order re Attend MSC + Proposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement: Settlement Conference - Pltfs' Sett Conf Statement (MSC) 10 26 16.pdf:

    Read MoreRead Less
159 More Docket Entries
  • 09/13/2013
  • Proof of Service: Mail - Judicial Officer: McKenney, Kevin E; Comment: Text = Premp. Challenge served Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc/Regular Mail Decision = M Closed = 09/13/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2013
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Judicial Officer: McKenney, Kevin E; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 09/10/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2013
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Judicial Officer: McKenney, Kevin E; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 09/10/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2013
  • Notice: Reassignment of Case - Judicial Officer: McKenney, Kevin E; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Reassignment of Case Decision = M Closed = 08/29/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2013
  • Declaration - Judicial Officer: Kleinberg, James P; Comment: Text = of Order Deeming Case NOT COMPLEX Legacy Name = CV Clerk's Decl of Service Decision = M Closed = 08/29/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2013
  • Order: Deeming Case Not Complex - Judicial Officer: Kleinberg, James P; Comment: Text = SIGNED BY JUDGE JAMES P. KLEINBERG Legacy Name = CV Order Deeming Case Not Complex Decision = M Closed = 08/29/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2013
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Judicial Officer: Kleinberg, James P; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Summons Filed Decision = M Closed = 07/31/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2013
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Judicial Officer: Kleinberg, James P; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Complex Complaint Decision = M Closed = 07/31/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2013
  • Complex Litigation: Provisional - Judicial Officer: Kleinberg, James P; Comment: Text = 7,9,10 Legacy Name = CV Complex Lit/Provisional Decision = M Closed = 07/31/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2013
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet - Judicial Officer: Kleinberg, James P; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Case Cover Sheet Decision = M Closed = 07/31/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer REICH, LINDA B

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ESQ. GEORGE KNOPFLER

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara