This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/25/2019 at 15:55:33 (UTC).

Butler V. Apple Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/28/2014 Butler filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against Apple Inc. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Walsh, Brian C and Kirwan, Peter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************2989

  • Filing Date:

    03/28/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Walsh, Brian C

Kirwan, Peter

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Thomas J. Butler

Butler, Thomas J.

Defendant

Apple Inc.

Other

Superior Court of California County of Santa Clara

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jeffrey F. Keller

64 Toledo Way

San Francisco, CA 94123

Bernstein, Scot D.

Sarkis, Sunny September

Keller, Jeffrey F.

Defendant Attorneys

Walsh, David Michael

Bartolomeo, Kai Shields

Sevell, Adam Matthew

Other Attorney

Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara

 

Court Documents

Notice

Notice CMC reset from 1-27-17 to 2-3-17: Comment: CMC reset from 1/27/17 to 2/3/17

Stipulation and Order

Stip & Order re Motion for Class Certification: Comment: Stipulation & Order Continuing Plaintiff's Deadline to File Motion for Class Certification and Setting Class Certification Briefing Schedule - signed by Judge Peter H. Kirwan

Order

Order Case is Reassigned to Hon. Brian C. Walsh: Comment: Order & Notice of Reassignment of Case to Hon. Brian C. Walsh

Notice

Notice CMC reset from 1-25-17 to 1-27-17: Comment: CMC reset from 1/25/17 to 1/27/17

Notice

Notice CMC set for 1-25-17 at 10am in D1: Comment: CMC set for 1/25/17 at 10am in D1

Statement: Case Management Conference

Updated Joint Case Management Statement.pdf: Comment: Updated Joint Case Management Statement

Notice

Notice CMC reset from 10-28-16 to 11-30-16 at 9am + IDC: Comment: CMC reset from 10/28/16 to 11/30/16 at 9am in D1, with Informal Discovery Conference to be heard concurrently with CMC

Order

Order Approving Stipulation Continuing Plaintiff's Deadline: Comment: Order Approving Stipulation Continuing Plaintiff's Deadline to File Motion for Class Certification and Setting Class Certification Briefing Schedule - signed by Judge Peter H. Kirwan

Stipulation and Order

Stip Continue Pltf's Class Cert Schedule.pdf: Comment: Stip Continuing Pltf's Deadline to File Motion for Class Cert and Setting Class Cert Briefing Schedule

Statement: Case Management Conference

Statement Case Management Conference: Comment: Updated Joint Case Management Statement

Notice

Notice CMC reset from 7-14-17 to 7-28-17: Comment: CMC reset from 7/14/17 to 7/28/17

Notice

Notice CMC reset from 7-7-17 to 7-14-17: Comment: CMC reset from 7/7/17 to 7/14/17

Notice

Notice CMC reset from 6-30-17 to 7-7-17: Comment: CMC reset from 6/30/17 to 7/7/17

Notice

Notice CMC reset from 10-13-17 to 6-30-17: Comment: CMC reset from 10/13/17 to 6/30/17; class certification briefing schedule is vacated

Proof of Service: Electronic

Proof of Service Electronic: Comment: (Amended)

Stipulation

2017-03-22 Stipulation.pdf: Comment: Stipulation

Notice

Notice CMC set for 10-13-17 at 10am in D1: Comment: CMC set for 10/13/17 at 10am in D1

Statement: Case Management Conference

Butler - Updated CMC.pdf: Comment: Updated Joint

73 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Conference: Case Management - Stipulation to Extend Time for Action to be Brought to Trial: Order Approving Extention of Time to Bring Action to Trial to 12-31-19: Judicial Officer: Walsh, Brian C; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Comment: (11th CMC) [iPHone 4s devices and iOS7] Proposed Class Action. Stay on discovery issued on 4/14/14 was lifted on 11/6/15, only as to class certification issues; last day to file motion for class certification is 6/1/17;opposition due 8/1/17; reply due 10/1/17 --- this class certification schedule was vacated by the Court, at the parties request (see Stipulation, filed 3/22/17). 1st Amended Complaint filed 3/27/15. Mediation with Hon. Edward A. Infante (Ret). on 1/11/18. SETTLED. SOL extended to 12/31/19; see Order entered 1/2/19. 2nd Amended Complaint filed 5/16/19.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion: Final Fairness Hearing - Order After HRG 4-19-19: 2019-05-10 Notice of Lodging Revised Notice to the Class: Order Approving Revised Notice to the Class: SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT: Stipulation Continuing Final Approval Hearing: Order Continuing Final Approval Hearing: Notice of Lodging Revised Notice to the Class: Order Approving Revised Notice to Certain Class Members: Judicial Officer: Walsh, Brian C; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Revised Notice to the Class approved by the Court on 5/13/19.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order - Order Approving Revised Notice to Certain Class Members: Comment: Order Approving Revised Notice to Certain Class Members - signed/BCW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice - Notice of Lodging Revised Notice to the Class: Comment: Notice of Lodging Revised Notice to the Class

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order - Order Continuing Final Approval Hearing: Comment: Order Continuing Final Approval Hearing - signed/BCW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation - Stipulation Continuing Final Approval Hearing: Comment: Stipulation Continuing Final Approval Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Amended Complaint Filed - No Fee - SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT: Comment: Second Amended Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order - Order Approving Revised Notice to the Class: Comment: Order Approving Revised Notice to the Class - signed/BCW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice - 2019-05-10 Notice of Lodging Revised Notice to the Class: Comment: Notice of Lodging Revised Notice to the Class

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order - Order After HRG 4-19-19: Comment: Order After Hearing on 4/19/19 (1) Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement; (2) Motion to Seal - signed/BCW

    Read MoreRead Less
198 More Docket Entries
  • 05/06/2014
  • Notice: Entry of Order - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Comment: Text = atty been **EF 62826** Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Entry of Order Decision = M Closed = 05/07/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2014
  • Notice - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Comment: Text = ntc of payment of complex fee. EF- G2571 Legacy Name = CV Ntc of... Decision = M Closed = 04/24/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2014
  • Document: Complex Lit - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Complex Fee Payment Decision = M Closed = 04/24/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2014
  • Notice: Appearance - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Comment: Text = EF- 62571 Legacy Name = CV Ntc of Appearance Decision = M Closed = 04/24/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2014
  • Order: Deeming Case Complex - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Comment: Text = #G-62300 Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery - signed by Judge Peter H. Kirwan Legacy Name = CV Order Deeming Case Complex Decision = M Closed = 04/14/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2014
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 04/08/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2014
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Summons Filed Decision = M Closed = 03/28/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2014
  • Document: Complex Lit - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Complex Fee Payment Decision = M Closed = 03/28/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2014
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Comment: Text = 8, 9, 10, 12 Legacy Name = CV Complaint Filed/Summs Issued Decision = M Closed = 03/28/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2014
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Case Cover Sheet Decision = M Closed = 03/28/2014

    Read MoreRead Less