This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 11/30/2022 at 17:25:25 (UTC).

Bryan v. Orange Coast Title Company of Northern California, et al. (PAGA)

Case Summary

On 11/01/2022 Bryan filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Orange Coast Title Company of Northern California, PAGA. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5756

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Amber Bryan

Defendants

Orange Coast Title Company of Northern California

Orange Coast Title Company

Not Classified By Court

Superior Court of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Tuvia Korobkin

William Zev Abramson

Jack J Gindi

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/1/2022 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons: Issued/Filed

11/1/2022 Summons: Issued/Filed

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

11/1/2022 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Civil Lawsuit Notice

11/2/2022 Civil Lawsuit Notice

Order: Deeming Case Complex

11/2/2022 Order: Deeming Case Complex

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2023
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 1; Time: 2:30PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order: Deeming Case Complex; Filed By: Superior Court of California,; Comment: Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline - signed/SRK.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Lawsuit Notice; Comment: 1st CMC set for 3/23/23 at 2:30pm in D1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Amber Bryan,; Comment: PAGA Representative Action Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Amber Bryan,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Amber Bryan,; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet * Complex * PAGA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ORANGE COAST TITLE COMPANY OF NORTHERN CALIFORNIA is a litigant

Latest cases where ORANGE COAST TITLE COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Superior Court of California is a litigant