This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 12:48:59 (UTC).

Brittany Pawluk vs Matthew Pawluk

Case Summary

On 10/04/2018 Brittany Pawluk filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Matthew Pawluk. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Scott, Stuart J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3883

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Family Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Scott, Stuart J

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Pawluk, Brittany Erin

Respondent

Pawluk, Matthew Stephen

Minors

Pawluk, William

Pawluk, Emma

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Saenz, Christie L

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2019
  • Notice: Case Status

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Notice: Case Status

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • Declaration: Under UCCJEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • Response: Dissolution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • Request for Order: Custody/Visitation/Support - Judicial Officer: Scott, Stuart J; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Matter Heard; Comment: c/s, s/s-lci- per 11-7-18 s/o -rc c/f 11-15-18 o 1-31-19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Substitution: Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • Stipulation: Temporary Judge/Commissioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • Stipulation and Order - Comment: temp. c/s; s/s

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • Stipulation and Order

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/10/2018
  • Request for Order: Other (No Fee) - Comment: Amended

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Declaration: In Support

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Request for Order (Initial) - Comment: Request for Order (Initial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Declaration: Income and Expense

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Declaration: Under UCCJEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Petition: Dissolution w/minor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Declaration: Under UCCJEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less