This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 12:49:01 (UTC).

Brianna Alpers vs Michael Alpers

Case Summary

On 10/04/2018 Brianna Alpers filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Michael Alpers. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is McGowen, Beth. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3884

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Family Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

McGowen, Beth

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Alpers, Brianna

Respondent

Alpers, Michael

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Cirlin, Lauren Desiree

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2019
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: McGowen, Beth; Judgment Type: Judgment/order (FL); Party: Names: Alpers, Brianna; Alpers, Michael

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • Judgment: Notice of Entry (Family)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • Judgment: Dissolution/FC2336

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • Appearance Stipulation & Waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • Stipulation and Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Final)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • Declaration for default filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Notice: Case Status

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Notice: Case Status

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • FC 2336 Packet Received for Review

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/25/2018
  • Response: Dissolution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary) - Comment: Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • Proof of Service of Summons Filed - Comment: petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Comment: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Declaration: Income and Expense

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Declaration: Property - Comment: Declaration: Property-separate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Declaration: Property - Comment: Declaration: Property- community

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Petition: Dissolution no minor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Petition: Dissolution

    Read MoreRead Less