This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 11/14/2022 at 18:03:44 (UTC).

Keitz v. Apex Security Group, Inc. (Class Action)

Case Summary

On 09/15/2022 Keitz filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Apex Security Group, Inc Class Action. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3171

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BRIAN KEITZ

Defendant

APEX SECURITY GROUP, INC.

Not Classified By Court

Superior Court of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

George Stephen Azadian

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara

 

Court Documents

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

9/15/2022 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/15/2022 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons: Issued/Filed

9/15/2022 Summons: Issued/Filed

Order: Deeming Case Complex

9/19/2022 Order: Deeming Case Complex

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2023
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 1; Time: 2:30PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order: Deeming Case Complex; Comment: Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline - signed/SRK.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: BRIAN KEITZ,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: BRIAN KEITZ,; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet * Complex * Class Action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: BRIAN KEITZ,; Comment: Class Action Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where APEX SECURITY GROUP INC . is a litigant

Latest cases where Superior Court of California is a litigant