Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/16/2019 at 16:26:18 (UTC).

Brett Parker and Joyce Chen

Case Summary

On 04/29/2015 Brett Parker and Joyce Chen was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Saldivar, Gregory H, Joseph, Irwin, Scott, Stuart J and Grilli, Mary Ann. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************4519

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Family Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Saldivar, Gregory H

Joseph, Irwin

Scott, Stuart J

Grilli, Mary Ann

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brett Parker

Petitioner

Parker, Brett

Defendant

Joyce Chen

Respondent

Chen, Joyce

Not Classified By Court

County Of Santa Clara

Minor

Parker, Melanie Ann

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Rudy, Matthew Jacob

Respondent Attorney

Berman, Ekaterina

Not Classified By Court Attorneys

Space, Nancy A.

Mears, Michael Scott

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Scott, Stuart J; Judgment Type: Judgment/order (FL); Party: Names: Parker, Brett; Chen, Joyce; Parker, Melanie Ann; County Of Santa Clara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • Notice: Withdrawal of Attorney of Record - Comment: w/pos

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • Notice: Withdrawal of Attorney of Record - Comment: ptr's ntc of withdrawal of atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • Proof of Service: Mail - Comment: judgmnt, fl-130, fl-144, fl-170 (filed 10/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • Declaration for default filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • Appearance Stipulation & Waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • Stipulation and Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • Notice: Entry of Judgment w/POS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • Judgment: Dissolution/FC2336

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Proof of Service: Mail - Comment: oah (p; r; Matthew Rudy; Ekaterina Berman)

    Read MoreRead Less
59 More Docket Entries
  • 08/10/2015
  • Responsive Declaration to Request for Order - Judicial Officer: Grilli, Mary Ann; Comment: Text = hrg 8/11/15 Legacy Name = FL Resp Decl to Request for Order Decision = M Closed = 08/10/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2015
  • Request for Order: Custody/Child Support - Judicial Officer: Grilli, Mary Ann; Comment: Text = (R) spousal support, other: return of wedding rings Legacy Name = FL Req for Ord:Custody/Support Decision = M Closed = 08/11/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2015
  • Declaration: Income and Expense - Judicial Officer: Grilli, Mary Ann; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Income/Expense Decl Decision = M Closed = 05/18/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2015
  • Declaration: Under UCCJEA - Judicial Officer: Grilli, Mary Ann; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl:Uniform Custody Act Decision = M Closed = 05/18/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2015
  • Response: Dissolution - Judicial Officer: Grilli, Mary Ann; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Response DS/NL/LS Decision = M Closed = 05/18/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2015
  • Proof of Service of Summons Filed - Judicial Officer: Grilli, Mary Ann; Comment: Text = petition, summons Legacy Name = FL Proof of Svc/Summons Decision = M Closed = 05/18/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2015
  • Declaration: Under UCCJEA - Judicial Officer: Grilli, Mary Ann; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl:Uniform Custody Act Decision = M Closed = 04/29/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2015
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Judicial Officer: Grilli, Mary Ann; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Summons Decision = M Closed = 04/29/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2015
  • Petition: Dissolution w/minor - Judicial Officer: Grilli, Mary Ann; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Petn:Dissol of Marriage w/Minor Decision = M Closed = 04/29/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2015
  • Declaration: Residence - Judicial Officer: Grilli, Mary Ann; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl of Residence Decision = M Closed = 04/29/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rudy, Matthew Jacob