This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/17/2019 at 19:04:14 (UTC).

Box, et al. v. Bayer Corp., et al.

Case Summary

On 03/16/2016 Box filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Bayer Corp . This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kirwan, Peter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2795

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kirwan, Peter

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Box, Donna

Gadlage, Cynthia

Defendants

Bayer Healthcare LLC

Bayer, Corp.

Conceptus, Inc.

Bayer Essure, Inc.

Bayer A.G.

Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Bayer Essure Inc.

Other

Superior Court of California County of Santa Clara

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hamilton, Timothy M.

Defendant Attorneys

Degen, Alycia Ann

Dugan, Bradley James

Other Attorney

Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara

 

Court Documents

Application: Pro Hac Vice Renewal

Application For Admission Of George M. Fleming To The Bar Of This Court Pro Hac Vice: Comment: Application For Admission Of George M. Fleming To The Bar Of This Court Pro Hac Vice

Notice

Notice of Hearing: Comment: Notice of Hearing

Notice

Notice Of Hearing: Comment: Notice Of Hearing

Memorandum: Points and Authorities

Memorandum of Points & Authorities: Comment: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Application: Pro Hac Vice Renewal

Application For Admission Of David Hobbs To The Bar Of This Court Pro Hac Vice: Comment: Application For Admission Of David Hobbs To The Bar Of This Court Pro Hac Vice

Memorandum: Points and Authorities

Memorandum of Points & Authorities: Comment: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2016
  • Court Reporter Fee < 1 hour - Comment: 8/12/16 Pro Hac Vice Hrg for George Fleming

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2016
  • Court Reporter Fee < 1 hour - Comment: 8/12/16 Pro Hac Vice Hrg for David Hobbs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2016
  • Conference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2016
  • Order - Comment: Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Application of George M. Fleming - signed by Judge Peter H. Kirwan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2016
  • Reserved - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: PHV x2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2016
  • Notice: Entry of Order - Comment: Consolidating Cases for Pretrial Purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Application: Pro Hac Vice Renewal - Application For Admission Of George M. Fleming To The Bar Of This Court Pro Hac Vice: Comment: Application For Admission Of George M. Fleming To The Bar Of This Court Pro Hac Vice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice - Notice of Hearing: Comment: Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice - Notice Of Hearing: Comment: Notice Of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum: Points and Authorities - Memorandum of Points & Authorities: Comment: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 04/11/2016
  • Order: Deeming Case Complex - Comment: #G-82698 Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery - signed by Judge Peter H. Kirwan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • Notice: Related Cases - Comment: 2015-1-CV-287441, 16CV290019, 16CV290017, 16Cv291822, 16CV291819, 16CV292130, 16CV292016, 16CV292406, 16CV292783, 16CV293091 and other cases pending in the County of Alameda

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • First Paper Filed - Fee - Comment: taken with ntc of related case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • Clerk's Notice - Comment: #G-82582 CMC reset from 7/12/16 to 7/22/16 by the Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • Order - Comment: #G-82581 Order & Notice of Reassignment of Case - signed by Judge Peter H. Kirwan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet - Comment: AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • Complex Litigation: Provisional - Comment: 8,9,10,11,12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2016
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2016
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less