This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/09/2022 at 17:03:24 (UTC).

Bour v. Global Spectrum, LP, et al. (Class Action)

Case Summary

On 07/12/2022 Bour filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Global Spectrum, LP, Class Action. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0275

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kirstinn Bour

Defendants

Global Spectrum, LP

Oak View Group, LLC

Not Classified By Court

Superior Court of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jessica Lynn Campbell

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara

 

Court Documents

Civil Lawsuit Notice

7/12/2022 Civil Lawsuit Notice

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/12/2022 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons: Issued/Filed

7/12/2022 Summons: Issued/Filed

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

7/12/2022 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Order: Deeming Case Complex

7/13/2022 Order: Deeming Case Complex

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2022
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 3; Time: 2:30PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order: Deeming Case Complex; Filed By: Superior Court of California,; Comment: Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline - signed/PML.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Kirstinn Bour,; Comment: Class Action Complaint + Complex Fee paid by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Kirstinn Bour,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Kirstinn Bour,; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet * Complex * Class Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Lawsuit Notice; Comment: 1st CMC set for 11/23/22 at 2:30pm in D3

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Oak View Group, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Superior Court of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara