This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 12:31:52 (UTC).

Brooke S. Chaloux vs Morgan D. Chaloux

Case Summary

On 01/16/2018 Brooke S Chaloux filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Morgan D Chaloux. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Towery, James E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0174

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Family Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Towery, James E

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Chaloux, Booke S.

Chaloux, Brooke S.

Respondent

Chaloux, Morgan D.

Minors

Chaloux, Camren

Chaloux, Dylan

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2019
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Towery, James E; Judgment Type: Judgment/order (FL); Party: Names: Chaloux, Brooke S.; Chaloux, Morgan D.; Chaloux, Dylan; Chaloux, Camren

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • Judgment: Notice of Entry (Family)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • Judgment: Dissolution/FC2336

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • Stipulation and Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • Declaration for default filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • FC 2336 Packet Received for Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • Proof of Service of Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • Request: Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • Order: Income Withholding for Support

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • Stipulation and Order - Comment: c/s

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • Fee Waiver Order-Grant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • Fee Waiver Application

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Declaration: Under UCCJEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less