This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 03/13/2018 at 15:22:59 (UTC).

Bonnie L. Turner and Alfred P. Turner

Case Summary

On 06/25/2009 Bonnie L Turner and Alfred P Turner was filed as a Family - Legal Separation lawsuit. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Bernardini, Susan, McKenney, Kevin E, Copeland, Christine and Mills, Edward F. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************0091

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Legal Separation

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Bernardini, Susan

McKenney, Kevin E

Copeland, Christine

Mills, Edward F

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bonnie Lo Turner

Fort Collins, CO 80521

Petitioner

Turner, Bonnie Lo

Defendant

Alfred Paul Turner

Morgan Hill, CA 95037

Respondent

Turner, Alfred Paul

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2010
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Judgment/order (FL); Party: Name: Turner, Alfred Paul; Party: Name: Turner, Bonnie Lo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • Miscellaneous: Converted Document - Comment: Request for Accomodations 12-13-11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2012
  • Proof of Service: Mail - Judicial Officer: Bernardini, Susan; Comment: Text = earnings assignment order for spousal (HRSSC) Legacy Name = FL Proof of Svc/Mail Decision = M Closed = 02/10/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2012
  • Order: Wage and Earning Assignment for Spousal Support - Judicial Officer: Bernardini, Susan; Comment: Text = Amended Legacy Name = FL Wage & Earn Asst Order For S/S Decision = G Closed = 01/05/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2011
  • OSC: Spousal Support - Original Type: OSC: Spousal Support; Judicial Officer: Bernardini, Susan; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Not settled; Comment: Text = correct date of marriage p/st Result By = C Result Judge = SB3 - Bernardini, Susan Result Date = 12/20/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2011
  • Stipulation and Order - Judicial Officer: Bernardini, Susan; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Stip and Order Decision = M Closed = 12/20/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2011
  • Order: Wage and Earning Assignment for Spousal Support - Judicial Officer: Bernardini, Susan; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Wage & Earn Asst Order For S/S Decision = M Closed = 12/20/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2011
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Bernardini, Susan; Comment: Legacy Name = FL-Proof of Svc Decision = M Closed = 12/13/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2011
  • Proof of Service: Personal - Judicial Officer: Bernardini, Susan; Comment: Text = osc (r) Legacy Name = FL Proof of Personal Svc Decision = M Closed = 12/07/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2011
  • OSC: Spousal Support - Judicial Officer: Bernardini, Susan; Comment: Text = correct date of marriage Legacy Name = FL OSC:Spousal Support Decision = M Closed = 11/14/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 06/25/2009
  • Bulk Scanned Documents-Conversion Case - Comment: Bulk Scan 06-25-09 to 02-10-12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2009
  • OSC: Spousal Support - Judicial Officer: McKenney, Kevin E; Comment: Text = (p)other-lag copies pp/pu-lag Legacy Name = FL OSC:Spousal Support Closed = 08/12/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2009
  • Order - Judicial Officer: McKenney, Kevin E; Comment: Text = granted for four months-lag Legacy Name = FL Ord:Fee Waiver Decision = G Closed = 06/25/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2009
  • Declaration: Property - Judicial Officer: McKenney, Kevin E; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Property Declaration Decision = M Closed = 06/25/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2009
  • Declaration: Residence - Judicial Officer: McKenney, Kevin E; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl of Residence Decision = M Closed = 06/25/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2009
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Judicial Officer: McKenney, Kevin E; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Summons Decision = M Closed = 06/25/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2009
  • Petition: Legal Separation no minor - Judicial Officer: McKenney, Kevin E; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Petn:Legal Sep/no Minor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2009
  • Declaration: Income and Expense - Judicial Officer: McKenney, Kevin E; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Income/Expense Decl Decision = M Closed = 06/25/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2009
  • Fee Waiver Application - Judicial Officer: McKenney, Kevin E; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Appl:Fee Waiver Decision = M Closed = 06/25/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2009
  • Notice: Case Status - Judicial Officer: McKenney, Kevin E; Comment: Text = cmc set per petition. ts Legacy Name = FL-Ntc:Case Management Conf Decision = M Closed = 06/25/2009

    Read MoreRead Less