This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 01/06/2022 at 12:44:45 (UTC).

Bokf, NA vs Patriot Resources, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 09/18/2017 Bokf, NA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Patriot Resources, LLC. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Strickland, Elizabeth and Arand, Mary E. The case status is Other - Transferred.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6006

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Strickland, Elizabeth

Arand, Mary E

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Bokf, NA

Bank of Oklahoma

Defendants

Coombs, Steven F

Patriot Resources, LLC

Steven F Coombs

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Madnick, Harris Mark

Harris Mark Madnick

Defendant Attorneys

Bright, Gary Marshall

Gary Marshall Bright

 

Court Documents

Acknowledgement of Receipt: Transfer

3/14/2018 Acknowledgement of Receipt: Transfer

Notice: Entry of Order

3/2/2018 Notice: Entry of Order

Notice: Transmittal (Transfer Out)

3/2/2018 Notice: Transmittal (Transfer Out)

Stipulation and Order

2/15/2018 Stipulation and Order

Notice

1/19/2018 Notice

Minute Order

1/17/2018 Minute Order

Minute Order

1/17/2018 Minute Order

Statement: Case Management Conference

1/3/2018 Statement: Case Management Conference

Statement: Case Management Conference

12/21/2017 Statement: Case Management Conference

Notice of Hearing (no fee)

12/21/2017 Notice of Hearing (no fee)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

12/4/2017 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

12/4/2017 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Summons: Issued/Filed

9/18/2017 Summons: Issued/Filed

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Acknowledgement of Receipt: Transfer; Comment: Received on 3/12/18. New Case Number: 18CV01239.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Transmittal (Transfer Out); Filed By: Bokf, NA, Patriot Resources, LLC, Steven Coombs,; Comment: Transfer to: Santa Barbara County

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Entry of Order; Filed By: Bokf, NA,; Comment: Re Change of Venue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation and Order; Filed By: Bokf, NA,; Comment: The Clerk is authorized to transfer all the pleadings and papers to the clerk of the County of Santa Barbara after payment of the required fees (atty H. Mark Madnick), signed by Judge Arand.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice; Filed By: Bokf, NA,; Comment: of Continuance of CMC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 9; Time: 1:30PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: Patriot Resources, LLC, Steven Coombs,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice of Hearing (no fee); Filed By: Patriot Resources, LLC, Steven Coombs,; Comment: Motion to Transfer Action Based on Improper Venue Atty: Gary Bright 03/08/18 9am Dept 9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • DocketDescription: First Paper Filed - Fee; Filed By: Patriot Resources, LLC, Steven Coombs,; Comment: Atty: Gary Bright

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: Bokf, NA,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Bokf, NA, Steven Coombs,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Bokf, NA, Patriot Resources, LLC,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BANK OF OKLAHOMA, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MADNICK HARRIS MARK