This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 01/13/2022 at 00:46:45 (UTC).

BitClave PTE. LTD. vs Vasily Trofimchuk

Case Summary

On 05/22/2018 BitClave PTE LTD filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against Vasily Trofimchuk. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Stoelker, James L, Strickland, Elizabeth, Kulkarni, Sunil R, Zayner, Theodore C and Williams, Helen E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8574

  • Filing Date:

    05/22/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Stoelker, James L

Strickland, Elizabeth

Kulkarni, Sunil R

Zayner, Theodore C

Williams, Helen E

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Not Yet Classified and Cross Defendants

BitClave PTE. LTD.

Bessonov, Alexander

Alexander Bessonov

Astra Inc.

Vasily Trofimchuk

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Trofimchuk, Vasily

Astra Studio, Ooo

Astra Inc.

Trofimchuk, Pavel

Astra Studio

Pavel Trofimchuk

Receiver

Greg K Webster

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

Thompson, Patrick Shaun

Not Yet Classified and Defendant Attorneys

Alexander Avery

Lillis, Damien Patrick

Grayver, Leonard

Litovsky, Allan Zinovy

Brown, William James, Jr.

Patrick Shaun Thompson

Mark Aaron Serlin

Leonard Grayver

William James Brown

Allan Zinovy Litovsky

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Grayver, Leonard

Litovsky, Allan Zinovy

Brown, William James, Jr.

 

Court Documents

Conference: Settlement Jury

10/16/2019 Conference: Settlement Jury

Conference: Settlement Jury

10/16/2019 Conference: Settlement Jury

Conference: Settlement Jury

10/16/2019 Conference: Settlement Jury

Conference: Further Case Management

5/21/2019 Conference: Further Case Management

Conference: Further Case Management

5/21/2019 Conference: Further Case Management

Conference: Further Case Management

5/21/2019 Conference: Further Case Management

Conference: Further Case Management

2/5/2019 Conference: Further Case Management

Conference: Further Case Management

2/5/2019 Conference: Further Case Management

Conference: Further Case Management

2/5/2019 Conference: Further Case Management

Summons: Issued/Filed

5/22/2018 Summons: Issued/Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/22/2018 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

5/22/2018 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Proof of Service

5/23/2018 Proof of Service

Order

5/23/2018 Order

Declaration: In Support

5/23/2018 Declaration: In Support

Declaration: In Support

5/23/2018 Declaration: In Support

Application: Ex Parte (Fee Applies)

5/23/2018 Application: Ex Parte (Fee Applies)

Notice

5/25/2018 Notice

322 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order: Submitted Matter; Comment: Hrg: 10-22-20 *Please see order for details*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Motion: Vacate; Department: Department 8; Time: 9:00AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketDescription: Appeal: Notice of Abandonment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Appeal: Notice of Abandonment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service; Filed By: BitClave PTE. LTD., Alexander Bessonov,; Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Declaration; Filed By: BitClave PTE. LTD., Alexander Bessonov,; Comment: DECLARATION OF MARK A. SERLIN IN SUPPORT OF OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Declaration; Filed By: BitClave PTE. LTD., Alexander Bessonov,; Comment: DECLARATION OF GREG K. WEBSTER IN SUPPORT OF OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Opposition/Objections; Filed By: BitClave PTE. LTD., Alexander Bessonov,; Comment: OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING AND DEMAND THAT CONTINUED HEARING BE DROPPED FROM CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Mail; Filed By: Astra Inc.,; Comment: Proof of Service ib Astra Inc. of Order Granting Alexander Avery's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel for Astra Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
348 More Docket Entries
  • 05/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Undertaking; Filed By: BitClave PTE. LTD.,; Comment: Bond #: 2160524, American Insurance Company $10,000. Original is in Records in over head bin at Lead's desk.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service; Filed By: BitClave PTE. LTD.,; Comment: No Hearing - Proof of Service via Federal Express

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order; Filed By: BitClave PTE. LTD.,; Comment: Re: Plaintiff BitClave PTE. Ltd's Ex Parte Application for a Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause, SIGNED by Judge Stoelker

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: In Support; Filed By: BitClave PTE. LTD.,; Comment: Application for an OSC/TRO re: Preliminary Injunction, by atty Thompson.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: In Support; Filed By: BitClave PTE. LTD.,; Comment: Application for an OSC/TRO re: Preliminary Injunction, by atty Thompson.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Application: Ex Parte (Fee Applies); Filed By: BitClave PTE. LTD.,; Comment: Application for an OSC/TRO re: Preliminary Injunction, by atty Thompson.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: BitClave PTE. LTD.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: BitClave PTE. LTD.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: BitClave PTE. LTD.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Grayver, Leonard