Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/23/2019 at 19:06:02 (UTC).

Birnkrant V. Lynch, Et Al. (Hewlett-Packard Company)

Case Summary

On 12/14/2012 Birnkrant filed a Contract - Security lawsuit against Lynch, Hewlett-Packard Company. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kleinberg, James P. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************7927

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Security

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kleinberg, James P

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Miriam Birnkrant

Defendants

Michael R Lynch

Leo Apotheker

Margaret C Whitman

Catherine A Lesjak

G Kennedy Thompson

Rajiv L Gupta

Shumeet Banerji

Gary M Reiner

John H Hammergren

Marc L Andreessen

Raymond J Lane

Patricia F Russo

Ann M Livermore

Ralph V Whitworth

Shane V Robison

Lawrence T Babbio, Jr

Sari M Baldauf

Dominique Senequier

Deloitte, Llp

7 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

William J. Doyle Ii

10200 Willow Creek Road, Suite 150

San Diego, CA 92131

Other Attorneys

Floren, Joseph E.

Doyle II, William J.

Bookin, Daniel H.

Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati

Miller, Timothy Alan

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2013
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Dismissal - After Other ADR (CV); Party: Name: Morrical, Stanley; Party: Name: Hewlett-Packard Company; Party: Name: Barclays Capital; Party: Name: Perella Weinberg Partners UK LLP; Party: Name: KPMG LLP; Party: Name: Deloitte, LLP; Party: Name: Senequier, Dominique; Party: Name: Baldauf, Sari M.; Party: Name: Babbio, Lawrence T., Jr.; Party: Name: Robison, Shane V.; Party: Name: Whitworth, Ralph V.; Party: Name: Livermore, Ann M.; Party: Name: Russo, Patricia F.; Party: Name: Lane, Raymond J.; Party: Name: Andreessen, Marc L; Party: Name: Hammergren, John H.; Party: Name: Reiner, Gary M.; Party: Name: Banerji, Shumeet; Party: Name: Gupta, Rajiv L.; Party: Name: Thompson, G. Kennedy; Party: Name: Lesjak, Catherine A.; Party: Name: Whitman, Margaret C.; Party: Name: Apotheker, Leo; Party: Name: Lynch, Michael R.; Party: Name: Birnkrant, Miriam

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2013
  • Conference: Case Management - Original Type: Conference: Case Management; Judicial Officer: Kleinberg, James P; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Vacated; dismissal filed; Comment: Text = vacated; dismissal filed 3/26/13 Result By = C Result Judge = JPK - Kleinberg, James Result Date = 03/26/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2013
  • Conference: Case Management - Original Type: Conference: Case Management; Judicial Officer: Kleinberg, James P; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: vacated; reset current month; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = JPK - Kleinberg, James Result Date = 03/25/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2013
  • Request: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Kleinberg, James P; Comment: Text = #G-52498 Dismissal WITHOUT Prejudice of Entire Action (Atty W. Doyle) Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Entire w/o Prej Decision = M Closed = 03/26/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2013
  • Notice - Judicial Officer: Kleinberg, James P; Comment: Text = #G-52479 CMC reset from 4/12/13 to 4/26/13 - by the Court Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Continued CMC Decision = M Closed = 03/25/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2013
  • Notice: Appearance - Judicial Officer: Kleinberg, James P; Comment: Text = *ef-51834* Legacy Name = CV Ntc of Appearance Decision = M Closed = 03/01/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2013
  • Document: Complex Lit - Judicial Officer: Kleinberg, James P; Comment: Text = paid on ntc of appearance *ef-51834* Legacy Name = CV Complex Fee Payment Decision = M Closed = 03/01/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2013
  • Document: Complex Lit - Judicial Officer: Kleinberg, James P; Comment: Text = EF# G-51307 Paid on Notice of Appearance. Legacy Name = CV Complex Fee Payment Decision = M Closed = 02/13/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2013
  • Notice: Appearance - Judicial Officer: Kleinberg, James P; Comment: Text = EF# G-51307 Timothy Miller (SBN 154744) SKADDEN ARPS SLATE MEAGHER & FLOM LLP 525 University Ave, Suite 1400 Palo Alto, CA 94301 Tel: (650) 470-4500 Fax: (650) 470-4570 Legacy Name = CV Ntc of Appearance Decision = M Closed = 02/13/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2013
  • Document: Complex Lit - Judicial Officer: Kleinberg, James P; Comment: Text = *ef-51234* Legacy Name = CV Complex Fee Payment Decision = M Closed = 02/08/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/18/2013
  • Response/Reply - Judicial Officer: Kleinberg, James P; Comment: Text = #G-50593 Response to HP's Notice of Related Cases (113CV238913) (Atty M. Molumphy) Legacy Name = CV Response Decision = M Closed = 01/18/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2013
  • Response/Reply - Judicial Officer: Kleinberg, James P; Comment: Text = #G-50591 Response to HP's Notice of Related Cases (Atty M. Molumphy) Legacy Name = CV Response Decision = M Closed = 01/17/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2013
  • Notice: Related Cases - Judicial Officer: Kleinberg, James P; Comment: Text = 113CV238913 *ef-50325* Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Related Cases Decision = M Closed = 01/11/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2013
  • Notice: Appearance - Judicial Officer: Kleinberg, James P; Comment: Text = *ef-50325* Legacy Name = CV Ntc of Appearance Decision = M Closed = 01/11/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2013
  • Document: Complex Lit - Judicial Officer: Kleinberg, James P; Comment: Text = paid on ntc of appearance *ef-50325* Legacy Name = CV Complex Fee Payment Decision = M Closed = 01/11/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2012
  • Order: Deeming Case Complex - Judicial Officer: Kleinberg, James P; Comment: Text = #G-49929 signed by Judge James P. Kleinberg Legacy Name = CV Order Deeming Case Complex Decision = M Closed = 12/31/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2012
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Judicial Officer: Kleinberg, James P; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Summons Filed Decision = M Closed = 12/14/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2012
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Judicial Officer: Kleinberg, James P; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Complex Complaint Decision = M Closed = 12/14/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2012
  • Complex Litigation: Provisional - Judicial Officer: Kleinberg, James P; Comment: Text = 4,8,9,10,11 Legacy Name = CV Complex Lit/Provisional Decision = M Closed = 12/14/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2012
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet - Judicial Officer: Kleinberg, James P; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Case Cover Sheet Decision = M Closed = 12/14/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Deloitte USA LLP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel Henry Bookin

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FLOREN, JOSEPH E.