This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 02/23/2022 at 05:05:18 (UTC).

Billy Mitchell vs Katerra Inc et al

Case Summary

On 05/27/2021 Billy Mitchell filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Katerra Inc. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3052

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Billy Mitchell

Claimant

SENTRY INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

Katerra Inc

FPI Management, Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David Alexander Kleczek

Claimant Attorney

James Brian Sutherland

Defendant Attorneys

Jack C Praetzellis

Michael Adam Sweet

Gavin C P Campbell

Kathryne Elizabeth Baldwin

 

Court Documents

Statement: Case Management Conference

9/20/2021 Statement: Case Management Conference

Proof of Service: Electronic

9/20/2021 Proof of Service: Electronic

Notice: Lien Claimant

8/18/2021 Notice: Lien Claimant

Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

8/12/2021 Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Notice of Bankruptcy Stay - Partial

8/5/2021 Notice of Bankruptcy Stay - Partial

Notice

8/5/2021 Notice

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

5/27/2021 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/27/2021 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons: Issued/Filed

5/27/2021 Summons: Issued/Filed

Review: Case Status

2/10/2022 Review: Case Status

Review: Case Status

2/10/2022 Review: Case Status

Review: Case Status

2/10/2022 Review: Case Status

Substitution: Attorney

12/1/2021 Substitution: Attorney

Notice

2/3/2022 Notice

Minute Order

2/16/2022 Minute Order

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Review: Case Status; Department: Department 19; Time: 10:00AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice; Filed By: Billy Mitchell,; Comment: NOTICE OF TERMINATION OR MODIFICATION OF STAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Substitution: Attorney; Filed By: Katerra Inc,; Comment: Old: Campbell, New: Praetzellis and Sweet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Electronic; Filed By: Billy Mitchell,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: Billy Mitchell,; Comment: Plaintiff's Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Lien Claimant; Filed By: SENTRY INSURANCE COMPANY,; Comment: $406,931.28 total amount

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: FPI Management, Inc,; Comment: to complaint, Atty Baldwin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice of Bankruptcy Stay - Partial; Filed By: Katerra Inc,; Comment: Notice of Stay Of Proceedings

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice; Filed By: Katerra Inc,; Comment: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT KATERRA INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Billy Mitchell,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Billy Mitchell,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Billy Mitchell,

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Katerra Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases where FPI MANAGEMENT, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Sentry Insurance A Mutual Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sutherland, James B