Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 06:39:24 (UTC).

Estate of Richard Bigotti

Case Summary

On 07/27/2018 Estate of Richard Bigotti was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Pichon, Rise Jones. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********8930

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Pichon, Rise Jones

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Bigotti, Jerome F

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Anticouni, Marilyn Dorel

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2018
  • *Stat Closure: PR Judgment/Final Determination

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • Hearing: Petition - Judicial Officer: Pichon, Rise Jones; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Heard: Granted; Comment: for order transferring trust property to beneficiary (Marilyn Anticouni 805-882-9255)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • Order - Comment: Transferring Trust Property to Beneficiary

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • Order: Proposed - Comment: Proposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • Notice of Hearing - Comment: HRG 10/1718 Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • Notice of Hearing - Comment: Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • Petition - Comment: Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Bulk Scanned Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less