Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/18/2019 at 05:10:58 (UTC).

Beth Giansiracusa vs Mario Nguyen

Case Summary

On 07/08/2016 Beth Giansiracusa filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Mario Nguyen. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Kleinberg, Janet and Elfving, William J. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5419

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Kleinberg, Janet

Elfving, William J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Giansiracusa, Beth

Defendant

Nguyen, Mario

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2016
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Kleinberg, Janet; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested (SC); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Giansiracusa, Beth; Awarded Against: Nguyen, Mario; Amount; Damages: $4,164.95; Costs: $115.00; Total: $4279.95; Comment: ***Judg't Notice mailed to parties on 9/09/16.*** Contract is canceled.; Party: Names: Giansiracusa, Beth; Nguyen, Mario

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • Warrant: Returned and Filed - Comment: Unsuccessful Service on BW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • Declaration: Re: Diligence

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • Document: Other - Comment: Proof of Unsuccessful Service on BW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • Memorandum of Costs - Comment: Costs $ 345.00, Credit $ 0.00, Interest $ -, DOM: 03/27/17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • Warrant: Issued - Comment: BW & $50.00 check ponied to Santa Clara Sheriff's Dept on 03/21/17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • Hearing: Order of Examination - Judicial Officer: Elfving, William J; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2017
  • Proof of Service: Personal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • Declaration: Non-Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2017
  • Application for order for judgment debtor exam - Comment: OEX Service Copy Mailed to Jgmt Creditor on 01/17/16.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • Hearing: Order of Examination - Judicial Officer: Elfving, William J; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • Declaration: Non-Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • Application: Order of Examination - Comment: OEX Service copy mailed to Jgmt Creditor on 11-28-16.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2016
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Judicial Officer: Kleinberg, Janet; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2016
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2016
  • Stipulation - Comment: Stipulation Court Appointed Temporary Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • Proof of Service: Personal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2016
  • Plaintiff's Claim-$1,501 to $5,000

    Read MoreRead Less